Johnson v. Perrotta et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Charles Frank Perrotta and Inception Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv05645
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
1 Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Inception Homes, Inc., Charles Frank Perrotta (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Inception Homes, Inc., Charles Frank Perrotta.. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byInception Homes, Inc., Charles Frank Perrotta. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Morin (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 22, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Inception Homes, Inc. served on 10/13/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
September 25, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 14, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Inception Homes, Inc., Charles Frank Perrotta. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12680256.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Perrotta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Frank Perrotta
Represented By: Richard J Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inception Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?