United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. v. H2L1-CSC, JV et al
Plaintiff: United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.
Defendant: H2L1 ENGINEERING INC., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, H2L1-CSC, JV and COLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION
Case Number: 5:2018cv05748
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byCOLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION, H2L1 ENGINEERING INC., H2L1-CSC, JV, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Brinegar, Matthew) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC... (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.. H2L1-CSC, JV served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. POS2 H2L1-CSV-JV (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.. H2L1 ENGINEERING INC. served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. POS2 H2L1 ENGINEERING INC (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.. COLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. POS2 COLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. POS LIBERTY MUTUAL INS (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2018. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 18, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety Summons Returned Executed. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC., #9 Certificate of Service filed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC., #8 Certificate of Service filed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC., #7 Certificate of Service filed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME filed by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.. (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. COLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/12/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. H2L1 ENGINEERING INC. (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/12/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. H2L1-CSC-JV (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/12/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. POS LIBERTY MUTUAL INS (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 10/10/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. Blum Cert of Int Entities (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to COLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION, H2L1 ENGINEERING INC., H2L1-CSC, JV, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. against COLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION, H2L1 ENGINEERING INC., H2L1-CSC, JV, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12693286.). Filed byUnited States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Myer, Raymond) (Filed on 9/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC. v. H2L1-CSC, JV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States, For the Use of BLUM & SONS ELECTRIC, INC.
Represented By: Raymond Anthony Myer
Represented By: Ariana Adolphina Vugrek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H2L1 ENGINEERING INC.
Represented By: Matthew Allen Brinegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Allen Brinegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H2L1-CSC, JV
Represented By: Matthew Allen Brinegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLEMAN SPOHN CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Allen Brinegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?