Vickrey et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Donn J. Vickrey and Kim L. Vickrey
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv05942
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donn J. Vickrey, Kim L. Vickrey (Cahill, John) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 28, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2018. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Cahill, John) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Cahill, John) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 1 PETITION to Quash Summons Issued to Franklin Templeton Investor Services, LLC and Franklin Templeton Bank and Trust against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12717508). Filed byDonn J. Vickrey, Kim L. Vickrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Cahill, John) (Filed on 9/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickrey et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donn J. Vickrey
Represented By: John Gregory Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim L. Vickrey
Represented By: John Gregory Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?