Dulaney v. Ewing et al
Plaintiff: James Alvin Dulaney, Jr.
Defendant: D Bradbury, M. Hodges, R.K. Bell, Rhonda K. Amis, D. Short, Psych. J. Cummings, P. Chapa, D. Rusk, Windy Reynolds, Clark E. DuCart, Dane Ewing, Correctional Officer D. Barneburg, J. Berg, M. Voong and S. K. Hemenway
Case Number: 5:2018cv06059
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time as moot. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File IFP application filed by James Alvin Dulaney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Alvin Dulaney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 certificate)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Alvin Dulaney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 certificate, #2 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Complete in Forma Pauperis Application. Plaintiff shall file complete IFP motion on proper form and attach Certificate of Funds in Prisoner's Account completed and signed and a copy of prisoner trust account statement by 12/2/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File IFP filed by James Alvin Dulaney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/13/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rhonda K. Amis, D. Barneburg, R.K. Bell, J. Berg, D Bradbury, P. Chapa, J. Cummings, Clark E. DuCart, Dane Ewing, S. K. Hemenway, M. Hodges, Windy Reynolds, D. Rusk, D. Short, M. Voong. Filed byJames Alvin Dulaney, Jr. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dulaney v. Ewing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Bradbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.K. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda K. Amis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psych. J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Chapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windy Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark E. DuCart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer D. Barneburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. K. Hemenway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alvin Dulaney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?