Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv06428
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Cathy L. Arias for Starbucks Corporation. Julie Y. Zong is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case. (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy L. Arias (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Gaus, Arthur) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Starbucks Corporation (Gaus, Arthur) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byStarbucks Corporation. (Gaus, Arthur) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Starbucks Corporation served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Starbucks Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12780221.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Arthur Slezak Gaus
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?