Armstrong v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Holly A. Armstrong
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 5:2018cv06532
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
2 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:7402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to extend time for the United States to answer or otherwise respond filed by USA. (Healy Gallagher, Erin) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan David Howlette (Howlette, Jordan) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan David Howlette (Howlette, Jordan) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH**Following the case re-assignment to Judge Lucy Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 2/6/2019 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by USA.. (Healy Gallagher, Erin) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Kathleen Healy Gallagher (Healy Gallagher, Erin) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Holly A. Armstrong re #6 Summons Issued as to USA, #7 Certificate of Service Corrected to add Summons mailed (Perez, Hector) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Holly A. Armstrong re #6 Summons Issued as to USA and AG (Perez, Hector) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to USA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Perez, Hector) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/5/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Holly A. Armstrong re #1 Complaint, Cover Sheet and Exhibits (Perez, Hector) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2018. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA. Filed byHolly A. Armstrong. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #0971-12795918.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Perez, Hector) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly A. Armstrong
Represented By: Hector C Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jordan David Howlette
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Healy Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?