Kaufman v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Kaufman
Defendant: Alphabet Inc., XXVI Holdings Inc. and Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv06685
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa R. Emert (Emert, Melissa) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting (50) Stipulation in case 5:18-cv-05062-EJD (*modified). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-05062-EJD, 5:18-cv-05288-EJD, 5:18-cv-06262-EJD, 5:18-cv-06416-EJD, 5:18-cv-06652-EJD, 5:18-cv-06685-EJD(ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Melissa R. Emert, Counsel for Plaintiff Ronnie Kaufman. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12914583.) filed by Ronnie Kaufman. (Emert, Melissa) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Related Case Order. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 48 Administrative Motion to Relate Case to 5:18-cv-06685-HSG filed in 5:18-cv-05062-EJD. It is hereby ordered that Case 5:18-cv-05062-EJD is hereby related to case 5:18-cv-06685-HSG and such case shall be reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018) Modified text on 12/5/2018 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronnie Kaufman.. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, XXVI Holdings Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ronnie Kaufman (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, XXVI Holdings Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12818318.). Filed byRonnie Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 11/2/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XXVI Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Kaufman
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?