Johnson v. Yisrael 26, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Yisrael 26, LLC and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv06766
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byStarbucks Corporation. (Arias, Cathy) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Yisrael 26, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Starbucks Corporation served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Starbucks Corporation, Yisrael 26, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12831157.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/8/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Yisrael 26, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yisrael 26, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Cathy L. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?