Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan et al v. Petersen-Dean, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan and Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan
Defendant: PetersenDean Texas, Inc., OCR Services, Inc., Petersen-Dean Commercial, Inc., PetersenDeanRoofing and Solar Systems, Inc., Tri-Valley Supply, Inc., Sonoma Roofing Services, Inc., Pacific Coast Roofing & Construction, Inc., DOES 1-10,, OCR Solar & Roofing, Inc., MDF Holding Corp., Red Rose, Inc. and Petersen-Dean, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv06824
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2018 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pacific Coast Roofing & Construction, Inc., Petersen-Dean Commercial, Inc., Petersen-Dean, Inc., PetersenDean Texas, Inc., PetersenDeanRoofing and Solar Systems, Inc., Red Rose, Inc.. (Hill, Richard) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 10, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan, Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan re #1 Complaint, (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 16, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to MDF Holding Corp., OCR Services, Inc., OCR Solar & Roofing, Inc., Pacific Coast Roofing & Construction, Inc., Petersen-Dean Commercial, Inc., Petersen-Dean, Inc., PetersenDean Texas, Inc., PetersenDeanRoofing and Solar Systems, Inc., Red Rose, Inc., Sonoma Roofing Services, Inc., Tri-Valley Supply, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 7 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Additional Parties Attachment)(Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 13, 2018 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan, Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan, Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan.. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. **Summons Must List Names of All Parties to be served. An Additional page listing parties can be attached if necessary** Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 2 *Filing Error* Proposed Summons. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 11/9/2018) Modified on 11/13/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12837146.). Filed byPacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 11/9/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan et al v. Petersen-Dean, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PetersenDean Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCR Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petersen-Dean Commercial, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PetersenDeanRoofing and Solar Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Valley Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma Roofing Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Roofing & Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCR Solar & Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDF Holding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rose, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petersen-Dean, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Roofers Pension Plan
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?