Ahern et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Kim Ahearn, Nikolas Frenzel, Justin Evans and Kim Ahern
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv07196
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/8/2019. Replies due by 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kim Ahern, Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation Under L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Powers on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12925972.) filed by Kim Ahern, Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Patterson, Jerrod) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Ahern, Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel. Apple Inc. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. **Refile as Summons Returned Executed**Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #18 Affidavit of Service, filed by Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel, Kim Ahern (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 *Filing Error* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Albert Damonte on behalf of Apple, Inc. on 12/04/18, filed by Kim Ahern, Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/7/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12896297.) filed by Kim Ahern, Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 2/27/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7 days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/3/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings re #4 . This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018) Modified on 12/3/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 Civil Cover Sheet by Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel, Kim Ahern CORRECTION OF DOCKET [1-2]. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 11/30/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/30/18. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 *Filing Error, Disregard* Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) Modified on 11/30/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kim Ahearn, Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel.. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12881332.). Filed byKim Ahearn, Justin Evans, Nikolas Frenzel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Venue Declaration of Justin Evans, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/28/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahern et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Ahearn
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikolas Frenzel
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Evans
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Ahern
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?