Lee v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Lee
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv07235
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/18/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this matter to another Judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/3/18. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jessica Lee (Reisman, Daniel) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Reisman, Daniel) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12887137.). Filed byJessica Lee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Venue Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reisman, Daniel) (Filed on 11/29/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lee
Represented By: Daniel Alan Reisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?