Huynh v. Quora, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Plaintiff: Alexander Huynh, Jeri Connor and Erica Cooper
Defendant: Quora, Inc., a Delaware corporation and Quora, Inc.
Interested Party: Rick Musgrave
Case Number: 5:2018cv07597
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Wood. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13088195.) filed by Jeri Connor, Erica Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate)(Wood, Paul) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT (CONSOLIDATED) on behalf of Plaintiffs Huynh, Cooper, and Connor against Quora, Inc.. Filed byAlexander Huynh. (Monesi, Trisha) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 MOTION TO RELATE CASE. The Court hereby finds that this case is related to Musgrave v. Quora, Inc., No. 5:19-cv-00566-NC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/7/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Order Changing Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2 filed by Alexander Huynh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebekah S. Guyon in Support of Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2, #2 Proposed Order Changing Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2)(Zohdy, Tarek) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Ozzello as counsel for Plaintiff Alexander Huynh (Ozzello, Mark) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Rick Musgrave. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Blair) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; GRANTING #18 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE. Consolidated Amended Complaint due March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-07597-BLF, 5:18-cv-07680-BLF(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Quora, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #16 MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Parties shall advise the Court on or before January 31, 2019 whether the cases should be consolidated and whether a consolidated Complaint should be filed. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/24/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Relate Case Stipulated Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Quora, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Relate Cases, #2 Proposed Order Relating Cases, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Susanne Strawn Guyon (Guyon, Rebekah) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Quora, Inc. or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and N.D. Cal. Civil L.R. 3-15 (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond To Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Quora, Inc.. (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Ballon (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Huynh. Quora, Inc. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Zohdy, Tarek) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alexander Huynh.. (Zohdy, Tarek) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Quora, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alexander Huynh (Monesi, Trisha) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Monesi, Trisha) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quora, Inc., a Delaware corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12938278.). Filed byAlexander Huynh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monesi, Trisha) (Filed on 12/18/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huynh v. Quora, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quora, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quora, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Ballon
Represented By: Rebekah Susanne Strawn Guyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Huynh
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody Robert Padgett
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Connor
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: Paul R Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Cooper
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: Paul R Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rick Musgrave
Represented By: Blair E. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?