Quantum Labs, Inc. v. Maxim Integrated Products Inc et al

Plaintiff: Quantum Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Maxim Integrated Products Inc and Tunc Doluca
Case Number: 5:2018cv07598
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
1 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tunc Doluca, Maxim Integrated Products Inc (Ioannou, Michael) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byTunc Doluca, Maxim Integrated Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G to I to Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Ioannou, Michael) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Tunc Doluca, Maxim Integrated Products Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/1/2019. Replies due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Casper, #2 Exhibit A to C to Declaration of Mark Casper, #3 Declaration of Michael J. Ioannou, #4 Exhibit D to F to Declaration of Michael J. Ioannou, #5 Proposed Order)(Ioannou, Michael) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U. S. District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quantum Labs, Inc... (Isola, David) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tunc Doluca, Maxim Integrated Products Inc.. (Ioannou, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, EXTENDING THE TIME FOR MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC., TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Tunc Doluca, Maxim Integrated Products Inc. (Isaacson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quantum Labs, Inc.. Maxim Integrated Products Inc served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Isola, David) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]**Re-File as Summons Returned Executed**Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by Quantu m Labs, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quantum Labs, Inc. re #7 Summons Issued Maxim Integrated Products (Isola, David) (Filed on 1/18/2019) Modified on 1/22/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Tunc Doluca. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Isola, David) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Maxim Integrated Products Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quantum Labs, Inc. (Isola, David) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Isola, David) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Quantum Labs, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Simon Planck for Quantum Labs, Inc.. (Isola, David) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 0971-12938738 $400 Fee Paid against Tunc Doluca, Maxim Integrated Products Inc. Filed byQuantum Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Isola, David) (Filed on 12/19/2018) ($400 receipt #0971-12938738) Modified on 12/20/2018 (haS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quantum Labs, Inc. v. Maxim Integrated Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Integrated Products Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Ioannou
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunc Doluca
Represented By: Michael J. Ioannou
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantum Labs, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Isola
Represented By: Frederick Doyle Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?