Cares v. County of San Benito et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Jefferson Cares
Defendant: Darren Thompson, Paul Gilles, Kelly Burbank, Mitt French, Gregory LaForge, County of San Benito, Eric Triolo and Patrick Palacios
Case Number: 5:2018cv07651
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk's Office to Plaintiff Requesting Address for Service. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/31/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION; SCREENING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915; ORDERING SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Re: Dkt. Nos. #1 , #3 . Mr. Cares may submit an amended complaint within 30 days, by February 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Containing initial documents sent to Thomas Cares returned as undeliverable. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2019.Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/31/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Jefferson Cares. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kelly Burbank, County of San Benito, Mitt French, Paul Gilles, Gregory LaForge, Patrick Palacios, Darren Thompson, Eric Triolo. Filed by Thomas Jefferson Cares. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cares v. County of San Benito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jefferson Cares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Burbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitt French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory LaForge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Benito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Triolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?