Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Popsugar Inc.
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Defendant: Popsugar Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00297
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPopsugar Inc. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc... (Goonan, Gregory) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Peter Goonan (Goonan, Gregory) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna A. Porto (Porto, Anna) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Popsugar Inc and Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Popsugar Inc.. (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/1/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-10976. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California (ne)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF VENUE: THEREFORE, Plaintiff and Defendant, by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate that the parties agree to transfer venue of the Action to the Unites States District Court for the Northern District of California; IT IS FURTHER AGREED that Defendant shall file its response or answer to the Complaint within thirty (30) days after the United States District Court for the Northern District of California opens and assigns a docket number to this matter; IT IS FURTHER AGREED that the parties will bear their own respective costs and fees in connection with the Court's transfer of venue from New York to California. Good cause appearing, the above Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. This Action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/9/2019) (ne) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Popsugar Inc.. (Hur, Benedict)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/11/2018) (rro)
December 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Popsugar Inc. answer due 1/17/2019. (rro)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Benedict Y. Hur dated 12/10/2018. Document filed by Popsugar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hur, Benedict)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Benedict Yung Hur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2018) (ne)
December 7, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Benedict Yung Hur to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Benedict Yung Hur to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Popsugar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Benedict Y. Hur, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hur, Benedict)
December 6, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #7 MOTION for Benedict Yung Hur to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16015873.(Hur, Benedict)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Popsugar Inc.. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 25, 2018 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard)
November 25, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 25, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Popsugar Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Popsugar Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15953678)Document filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Popsugar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: Gregory Peter Goonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popsugar Inc
Represented By: Benedict Yung Hur
Represented By: Benedict Y. Hur
Represented By: Anna A. Porto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?