eBay (UK) Limited v. Gravity4, Inc.

Plaintiff: eBay (UK) Limited
Defendant: Gravity4, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00522
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by eBay (UK) Limited.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by eBay (UK) Limited. All Defendants. (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Re-file as Summons Returned Executed* Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Certificate of Service filed by eBa y (UK) Limited (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by eBay (UK) Limited re #6 Summons Issued (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 2/6/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Gravity4, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by eBay (UK) Limited identifying Corporate Parent Ebay International AG, Other Affiliate eBay Inc., Other Affiliate eBay International Management B.V., Other Affiliate eBay International Holding GmbH for eBay (UK) Limited. (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Breach of Contract and Demand for Jury Trial against Gravity4, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13046275.). Filed byeBay (UK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-J to Complaint)(Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 1/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eBay (UK) Limited v. Gravity4, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eBay (UK) Limited
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gravity4, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?