Henry Avocado Corporation v. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Henry Avocado Corporation
Defendant: Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris and Golden Rule Produce, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00581
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Henry Avocado Corporation. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 is terminated in light of settlement. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 11, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #16 Order: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Stipulation Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before March 11, 2019 confirming whether the parties have complied with the settlement terms and indicating whether they stipulate to dismissing the action. The hearing set for February 14, 2019 is VACATED.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Settlement filed by Henry Avocado Corporation. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] *** Please re-file the Consent or Declination separately.*** Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #14 and Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction, filed by Henry Avocado Corporation, #13 Summons Returned Executed, and Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction filed by Henry Avocado Corporation *** Please re-file separately*** (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Avocado Corporation. Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. also served [DE 4], [DE 5], [DE 9], [DE 11], and Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Avocado Corporation. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. also served [DE 4], [DE 5], [DE 9], [DE 11], and Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Avocado Corporation re #11 Order on Ex Parte Application (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 1, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #11 TRO Order: Deadline to serve TRO Order on Defendants is no later than 2/4/2019. Responses due by 2/8/2019. Replies due by 2/12/2019. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/14/2019 09:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #4 Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/1/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Golden Rule Produce, Inc., Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Henry Avocado Corporation, d/b/a CustomRipe Avocado Company. Responses due by 2/15/2019. Replies due by 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Henry Avocado Corporation, d/b/a CustomRipe Avocado Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit C - Certification of Counsel, #4 Proposed Order)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Henry Avocado Corporation, d/b/a CustomRipe Avocado Company (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13057619.). Filed byHenry Avocado Corporation, d/b/a CustomRipe Avocado Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Avocado Corporation v. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Avocado Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitrios (Jimmy) Tsigaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?