ZonTools, Inc. v. ZonTools.com

Plaintiff: ZonTools, Inc.
Defendant: ZonTools.com
Case Number: 5:2019cv00721
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ZONTOOLS.COM, AN INTERNET DOMAIN NAME (Related documents(s) #10 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 29, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #10 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Defendant ZonTools.com, an Internet domain name, filed by ZonTools, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant ZonTools.com, an Internet domain name, filed by ZonTools, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 3/29/2019) Modified on 3/29/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZonTools, Inc.. ZonTools.com served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ZonTools, Inc... (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ZonTools.com. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by ZonTools, Inc. of Lodging of Registrar Certificate (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by ZonTools, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Zon Tools, LLC, Other Affiliate Stefano Starkel, Other Affiliate Tarik Ozkan for ZonTools, Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Cybersquatting In Rem against ZonTools.com ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13079131.). Filed byZonTools, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 2/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZonTools, Inc. v. ZonTools.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZonTools, Inc.
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Liana W Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZonTools.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?