Victor Manuel Moya v. County of Monterey, et al.

Plaintiff: Victor Manuel Moya
Defendant: County Of Monterey, Richard Orwin and Sheriff Steve Bernal
Case Number: 5:2019cv00726
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Steve Bernal, County Of Monterey, Richard Orwin. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Victor Manuel Moya.. (Piccuta, Charles) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Piccuta, Charles) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or submission of fee waiver or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Monterey, Sheriff Steve Bernal and Richard Orwin. Filed by Victor Manuel Moya. ***(Filing Fee Paid of $400.00; Receipt #0971-13079255***) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Piccuta, Charles) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor Manuel Moya v. County of Monterey, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Manuel Moya
Represented By: Charles Anthony Piccuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Monterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Orwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Steve Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?