Gaffett v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: John Richard Gaffett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv00746
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: Susan van Keulen
1 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by John Richard Gaffett. United States Attorney General, 10th & Pennsylvania NW, Washington, DC served on 3/5/2019, answer due answer due 6/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by John Richard Gaffett. Commissioner of Social Security served Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear Street, Suite 800, San Francisco, CA 94105-1545 served on n 3/5/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form, #2 USM 285 form, #3 USM 285 form)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Richard Gaffett. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis With Leave To Amend.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Richard Gaffett. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Richard Gaffett.. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byJohn Richard Gaffett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waggoner, David) (Filed on 2/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaffett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Richard Gaffett
Represented By: David P. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?