CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. v. Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and Pabco Building Products, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00802
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Lucy H Koh
3 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/21/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2022)
August 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER RESOLVING Pending Motions in light of Noticed Settlement. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #362 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #363 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Opposition [Unredacted - Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit A [Unredacted - Filed Under Seal], #4 Exhibit K [Sealed], #5 Exhibit M [Sealed], #6 Exhibit N [Sealed])(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A [Unredacted - Filed Under Seal], #4 Exhibit Q [Sealed])(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Defendants' Material Should be Sealed), #352 MOTION in Limine - Omnibus Motion in Limine [Redacted] ) Statement Pursuant to LR 79-5(f)(3) in Response to ECF 353 filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #357 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re PC's Oppo to CT's Omnibus MIL (ECF 352), #358 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,,, Sealed Unredacted Opposition and Exhibits (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #345 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motions in Limine ) [Redacted] filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane E. Ghrist, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K (Sealed), #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M (Sealed), #15 Exhibit N (Sealed), #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q (Sealed), #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #352 MOTION in Limine - Omnibus Motion in Limine [Redacted], #357 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re PC's Oppo to CT's Omnibus MIL (ECF 352), #353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Defendants' Material Should be Sealed) ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mike Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's Omnibus MIL, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #7 Exhibit Ex 6 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #8 Exhibit Ex 7 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #9 Exhibit Ex 8 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #10 Exhibit Ex 9 Public Coversheet to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #11 Exhibit Ex 10 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #12 Exhibit Ex 11 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #13 Exhibit Ex 12 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Oppo to CT's MIL, #14 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying CT's MIL)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re PC's Oppo to CT's Omnibus MIL (ECF 352) filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PC's Mtn to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re Oppo to CT's Omnibus MIL, #2 Supplement SEALED PC's Opposition to CT's Omnibus MIL, #3 Exhibit SEALED Ex 1 to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine, #4 Exhibit SEALED Ex 3 to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine, #5 Exhibit SEALED Ex 4 to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine, #6 Exhibit SEALED Ex 5 to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine, #7 Exhibit SEALED Ex 6 to to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine, #8 Exhibit SEALED Ex 7 to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine, #9 Exhibit SEALED Ex 8 to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine, #10 Exhibit SEALED Ex 8 to Dec of HEINS ISO Pacific Coast's Opposition to CT's Motion in Limine)(Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk in Support of #344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 11 to Dec of M Heins ISP Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed)(Related document(s) #344 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #340 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Page Limits for Motions in Limine ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Defendants' Material Should be Sealed) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Defendants' Material Should be Sealed) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Omnibus Motion in Limine, #3 Exhibit 1 to Ghrist Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Ghrist Decl.)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION in Limine - Omnibus Motion in Limine [Redacted] filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 8/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane E. Ghrist, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ghrist Decl. [Sealed], #3 Exhibit 2 to Ghrist Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Ghrist Decl. [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 4 to Ghrist Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Ghrist Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Ghrist Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Ghrist Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Ghrist Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Ghrist Decl., #11 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Proposed Form of Verdict by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. (Joint). (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022) Modified on 8/11/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Joint Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022) Modified on 8/11/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Proposed Voir Dire by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. (Joint). (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Pabco Building Products, LLC, CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Statement of Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit 2 - CertainTeed's Statement of Contested Facts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pacific Coast's Statement of Contested Facts, #4 Exhibit 4 - CertainTeed's Statement of Contested Issues of Law, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pacific Coast's Statement of Contested Issues of Law, #6 Exhibit 6 - CertainTeed's Trial Witness List, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pacific Coast's Trial Witness List, #8 Exhibit 8 - CertainTeed's Affirmative/Counter-Counter Designations and Pacific Coast's Counter Designations, #9 Exhibit 9 - Pacific Coast's Affirmative Designations and CertainTeed's Objections to Pacific Coast's Affirmative Designations, #10 Exhibit 10 - CertainTeed's List of Pre-Marked Exhibits, #11 Exhibit 11 - Pacific Coast's List of Pre-Marked Exhibits, #12 Exhibit 12 - CertainTeed's Written Discovery List, #13 Exhibit 13 - Pacific Coast's Identification of Written Discovery)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 11 to Dec of M Heins ISP Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #345 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motions in Limine (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Responses due by 8/24/2022. Replies due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #2 Exhibit PUBLIC (face page) Exhibit 1 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #3 Exhibit PUBLIC (face page) Exhibit 2 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #12 Exhibit PUBLIC (face page) Exhibit 11 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #17 Proposed Order Granting Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 11 to Dec of M Heins ISP Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Pacific Coast's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re Omnibus Motions in Limine, #2 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 1 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #3 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 2 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine, #4 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 11 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Omnibus Motions in Limine)(Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 CLERK'S NOTICE. The requirement to provide paper copies of the pretrial filings and exhibits in this case is suspended until further Court order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #341 MOTION to Shorten Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Set Page Limits for Motions in Limine Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MOTION to Shorten Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Set Page Limits for Motions in Limine Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. Lowry, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Page Limits for Motions in Limine filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. Lowry, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER GRANTING #319 Application for Admission of Attorney Sami Al-Marzoog Pro Hac Vice representing CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #337 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 EXHIBITS re #324 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal CertainTeed's Proposed Redactions filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #324 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk in Support of CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Unsealed Version of Document Originally Filed at Dkt. [266-14], Refiled Pursuant to Order at Dkt. #311 filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk, #2 Exhibit 34 to the Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #327 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, #324 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal Pacific Coast's Proposed Seal Document relating to DKTS 324 and 327 (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***DISREGARD*** #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #320 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/5/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement . Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #322 Exhibits,, filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., #325 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Supplemental Brief re #255 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony and Opinions of Richard T. Kaczkowski and James E. Pampinella , #311 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,,, #263 Opposition/Response to Motion, #289 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, Public Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony and Exhibits 1 - 3 to Dec of Heins In Support Thereof filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony (289-02), #2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony (289-03), #3 Exhibit Ex 3 to Dec of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony (289-04))(Related document(s) #255 , #311 , #263 , #289 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Supplemental Brief re #246 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, #270 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, #311 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,,, Public Pacific Coast's Oppo with Exhibits 5 and 7 to Dec of M Heins in support thereof filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 5 to Dec of Heins ISO PC's Opposition to CT MSJ on Noninfringement (270-06), #2 Exhibit Ex 7 to Dec of Heins ISO PC's Opposition to CT MSJ on Noninfringement (270-08))(Related document(s) #246 , #270 , #311 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Supplemental Brief re #311 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,,, #251 Notice (Other),,, #273 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,,,, Refiling of Redacted Version Pacific Coast's Opposition to Certainteed's Omnibus Daubert Motion and Redacted Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael Heins in support thereof filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Dec of M Heins ISO PC's Opposition to CT's Omnibus Daubert)(Related document(s) #311 , #251 , #273 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Public redacted Exhibits to DKT 270-03 re #270 Opposition/Response to Motion, #311 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, Public Redacted Exhibit Pertaining to Dkt 270-03 filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Related document(s) #270 , #311 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/5/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 EXHIBITS re #327 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, #282 Reply to Opposition/Response, Public Redacted Exhibits to Pertaining to Exhibits Related to Dkt Nos 282-02, 282-04, and 282-05 filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 24 to CertainTeeds Reply in Support of its Omnibus Daubert Motion (DKT 282-04), #2 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 25 to CertainTeeds Reply in Support of its Omnibus Daubert Motion (282-05))(Related document(s) #327 , #282 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 EXHIBITS re #273 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,,,, #324 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal Public Redacted Exhibits to Pertaining to Exhibits Related to Dkt Nos 273-03, 273-05, 273-07, and 273-09 filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 4 to Pacific Coasts Opposition to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion Declaration of Heins (DKT 273-05), #2 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 6 to Pacific Coasts Opposition to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion Declaration of Heins (DKT 273-07), #3 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 8 to Pacific Coasts Oppos to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion Dec of Heins (DKT 273-09))(Related document(s) #273 , #324 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 EXHIBITS re Electronic Filing Error, #324 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal, #251 Notice (Other),,, Public Redacted Exhibits to Pertaining to Exhibits Related to Dkt Nos 256-02, 256-04, 256-07, 256-09, and 256-17 filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 3 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion {DKT 256-04], #2 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 6 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion [DKT 256-07], #3 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 8 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion [DKT 256-09], #4 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibit 16 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion [DKT 256-17])(Related document(s)[], #324 , #251 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 EXHIBITS re #324 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 2 to Pacific Coasts Opposition to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion Declaration of Heins, #2 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 3 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion, #3 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 4 to Pacific Coasts Opposition to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion Declaration of Heins, #4 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 6 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 6 to Pacific Coasts Opposition to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion Declaration of Heins, #6 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 8 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion, #7 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 8 to Pacific Coasts Opposition to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion Declaration of Heins, #8 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 16 to CertainTeeds Omnibus Daubert Motion, #9 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 22 to CertainTeeds Reply in Support of its Omnibus Daubert Motion, #10 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 24 to CertainTeeds Reply in Support of its Omnibus Daubert Motion, #11 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 25 to CertainTeeds Reply in Support of its Omnibus Daubert Motion)(Related document(s) #324 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #325 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 EXHIBITS re #324 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal CertainTeed's Proposed Redactions (Exhibit A) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #324 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal, #2 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk In Support of Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal, #3 Declaration of Michael Heins In Support of Joint Renewed Omnibus Motion to Seal, #4 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/5/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Reply In Support of its Omnibus Daubert Motion - Unredacted Version of Document Originally Filed Under Seal at Dkt. [294-1], Refiled Pursuant to Order at Dkt. #311 by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/5/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 EXHIBITS Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk in Support of CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Unsealed Version of Document Originally Filed at Dkt. [266-14], Refiled Pursuant to Order at Dkt. #311 filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 to the Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk in Support of CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Unsealed Version of Document Originally Filed at Dkt. [266-24], Refiled Pursuant to Order at Dkt. #311 )(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony - Unredacted version of Document Originally Filed Under Seal at Dkt. [264-1], Refiled Pursuant to Order at Dkt. #311 by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2022) Modified on 8/5/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 RESPONSE CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Omnibus Daubert Motion - Redacted Version of Dkt. [252-1] and [253-1] Pursuant to Order at Dkt. #311 by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 21)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17412600.) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Al-Marzoog, Sami) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER GRANTING #316 Application for Admission of Attorney Richard Lowry Pro Hac Vice representing CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER GRANTING #315 Application for Admission of Attorney David Zucker Pro Hac Vice representing CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17411293.) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Lowry, Richard) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17411121.) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Zucker, David) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle LaHatte (LaHatte, Gabrielle) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: #304 Motion for Bifurcation of Inequitable Conduct Claims and #305 Motion for Realignment of Parties. The hearing set for 8/3/2022, at 01:00 PM is VACATED. The Court finds the motions suitable for decision without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER RESOLVING Joint Omnibus Motion to Seal. Re: ECF #303 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 REPLY (re #305 Notice of Motion and Motion for Realignment of Parties ) filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce Li, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Li, Joyce) (Filed on 7/20/2022) Modified on 7/21/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 REPLY (re #304 MOTION to Bifurcate / Notice of Motion and Motion for Bifurcation of Inequitable Conduct Claims ) > filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce Li, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Li, Joyce) (Filed on 7/20/2022) Modified on 7/21/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Louis Perito (Perito, Andrew) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #305 Notice of Motion and Motion for Realignment of Parties ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/13/2022)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #304 MOTION to Bifurcate / Notice of Motion and Motion for Bifurcation of Inequitable Conduct Claims ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam M. Greenfield, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2., #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/13/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Notice of Motion and Motion for Realignment of Parties filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2022 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/13/2022. Replies due by 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #2 Exhibit 1 to Li Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Li, Joyce) (Filed on 6/29/2022) Modified on 6/30/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION to Bifurcate / Notice of Motion and Motion for Bifurcation of Inequitable Conduct Claims filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2022 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/13/2022. Replies due by 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Joyce) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Joint Omnibus MOTION to Seal re #300 Order filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.,Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and Pabco Building Products, LLC. Responses due by 7/11/2022. Replies due by 7/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/27/2022) Modified on 6/28/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING hearing set for 6/29/2022, at 01:00 PM re Motions for Summary Judgment, Dkt. Nos. #245 , #246 , #249 , and Motions Excluding Certain Expert Witness Testimony, Dkt. Nos. #255 , #256 . The Court finds the motions suitable for decision without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #247 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed. See redacted filing Dkt. No. [258-1]. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER to File Joint Omnibus Motion to Seal by June 27, 2022. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/13/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER GRANTING #293 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Declaration of Michael Heins in Support of #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Corrected Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Related document(s) #294 ) (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk in Support of #288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #288 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 SCHEDULING ORDER. Re [295-1]. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 5/18/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 JOINT Statement and [Proposed] Scheduling Orders by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and Pabco Building Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/18/2022) Modified on 5/19/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Corrected Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Its Omnibus Daubert Motion (sealed), #2 Exhibit 22 (sealed), #3 Exhibit 24 (sealed), #4 Exhibit 25 (sealed), #5 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents re #284 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane E. Ghrist, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/11/22, before Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:12 - 10:22. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #276 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2022. (Related documents(s) #276 ) (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #289 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, #288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Reply Motion and Exhibits Filed Under Seal (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 REPLY (re #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) of No Invalidity by Anticipation filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Heins ISO of Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity by Anticipation, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael Heins ISO of Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity by Anticipation)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 REPLY (re #255 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony and Opinions of Richard T. Kaczkowski and James E. Pampinella , #288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony, #2 Exhibit 1 [FILED UNDER SEAL] to Declaration of M Heins ISO of Pacific Coast's Reply ISO of Its Daubert Motion, #3 Exhibit 2 [FILED UNDER SEAL] to Declaration of M Heins ISO of Pacific Coast's Reply ISO of Its Daubert Motion, #4 Exhibit 3 [FILED UNDER SEAL] to Declaration of M Heins ISO of Pacific Coast's Reply ISO of Its Daubert Motion)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement SEALED UNREDACTED Version Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Daubert Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony [UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony [UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of M Heins ISO Pacific Coast's Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony [UNDER SEAL])(Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #282 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Responses due by 5/16/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Reply in Support of Its Omnibus Daubert Motion (***DOCUMENT REMOVED PER ORDER AT DOCKET #299 ***), # 2 Exhibit 22 (***DOCUMENT REMOVED PER ORDER AT DOCKET #299 ***), # 3 Exhibit 24 (***DOCUMENT REMOVED PER ORDER AT DOCKET #299 ***), # 4 Exhibit 25 (***DOCUMENT REMOVED PER ORDER AT DOCKET #299 ***), #5 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2022) Modified on 5/24/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 REPLY (re #256 MOTION for Order Excluding Certain Expert Witness Testimony for Failure to Comply with Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703 and Omnibus Daubert Motion (Redacted) ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane E. Ghrist, #2 Exhibit 22 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 25 (Filed Under Seal))(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 REPLY in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on CertainTeed's Inequitable Conduct Claims (re #245 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16)(Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 5/12/2022) Modified on 5/13/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk in Support of #269 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #269 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk in Support of #271 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defs Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed re Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #271 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 REPLY (re #246 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk, #2 Exhibit 34, #3 Exhibit 35)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Case Management Conference held telephonically on 5/11/2022. Parties to meet and confer and by 5/18, file a stip and proposed scheduling order. Case schedule remains in place; Hearing set for 6/29 remains set as Zoom webinar. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Matthew Moore, Rebecca Rabenstein, Adam Greenfield. Attorneys for Defendants: Jason Mueller, Ragesh Tangri, Michael Heins. AT&T Recording: 10:12am - 10:22am (10 minutes). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/11/2022) Transcriber: Tara Jauregui - Echo Reporting. Modified on 5/12/2022 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #271 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defs Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed re Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #273 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,,,, #272 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Pacific Coast's Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion (Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #269 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, #270 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, (Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #271 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defs Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed re Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #256 MOTION for Order Excluding Certain Expert Witness Testimony for Failure to Comply with Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703 and Omnibus Daubert Motion (Redacted) , #272 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Pacific Coast's Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 REDACTED to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #8 Exhibit 7 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #9 Exhibit 8 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #10 Exhibit 9 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #11 Exhibit 10 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #12 Exhibit 11 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #13 Exhibit 12 to Decl of M Heins ISO of Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Pacific Coast's Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M Heins ISO Admin Motion to Seal Docs Relating to Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defs Admin Motion to Seal Docs Relating to Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #3 Supplement UNREDACTED Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #4 Exhibit 1 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit 2 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #6 Exhibit 4 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #7 Exhibit 5 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #8 Exhibit 6 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #9 Exhibit 7 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #10 Exhibit 8 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #11 Exhibit 9 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #12 Exhibit 11 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion, #13 Exhibit 12 UNREDACTED to Dec of M Heins ISO Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion)(Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defs Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed re Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Omnibus Daubert Motion filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed re Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #2 Supplement SEALED UNREDACTED Motion Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 UNREDACTED to Decl of M Heins ISO Motion Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #4 Exhibit 2 UNREDACTED to Decl of M Heins ISO Motion Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit 4 UNREDACTED to Decl of M Heins ISO Motion Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #6 Exhibit 5 UNREDACTED to Decl of M Heins ISO Motion Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #7 Exhibit 6 UNREDACTED to Decl of M Heins ISO Motion Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion)(Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #246 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, #269 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Heins ISO of Opposition to Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl of M Heins ISO Opposition, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl of M Heins ISO Opposition, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl of M Heins ISO Opposition, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl of M Heins ISO Opposition, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl of M Heins ISO Opposition, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl of M Heins ISO Opposition, #8 Exhibit 7 to Decl of M Heins ISO Opposition)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed re Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pacific Coast's Administative Motion to file Other Party's Information Under Seal re Opposition to SJ, #2 Supplement SEALED UNREDACTED Version Pacific Coast's Opposition to CertainTeed's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, #3 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exhibit 2 to Decl of M. Heins ISO Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, #4 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exhibit 5 to Decl of M. Heins ISO Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement, #5 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exhibit 7 to Decl of M. Heins ISO Defs Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement)(Heins, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 34, #3 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #245 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 19, #10 Exhibit 20, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 22, #13 Exhibit 23, #14 Exhibit 24 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 25, #16 Exhibit 26, #17 Exhibit 27, #18 Exhibit 28, #19 Exhibit 29, #20 Exhibit 30, #21 Exhibit 31, #22 Exhibit 32, #23 Exhibit 33, #24 Exhibit 34 (Filed Under Seal), #25 Exhibit 35, #26 Exhibit 36, #27 Exhibit 37, #28 Exhibit 38, #29 Exhibit 39, #30 Exhibit 40, #31 Exhibit 41, #32 Exhibit 42, #33 Exhibit 43, #34 Exhibit 44, #35 Exhibit 45)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony (Sealed), #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #255 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony and Opinions of Richard T. Kaczkowski and James E. Pampinella ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane E. Ghrist, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam M. Greenfield, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Declaration of Jason Mueller in Support of #253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Related document(s) #253 ) (Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Declaration of Jason Mueller in Support of #247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 28 to Quirk Declaration filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted version of document sought to be filed under seal)(Related document(s) #247 ) (Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice the dispositive motion hearing re: #245 , #246 , 249], and daubert hearing re: #255 , #256 , set for 6/15/2022, is continued to 6/29/2022, at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https:// www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generate d by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MOTION for Order Excluding Certain Expert Witness Testimony for Failure to Comply with Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703 and Omnibus Daubert Motion (Redacted) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2022 01:00 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/6/2022. Replies due by 5/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane E. Ghrist, #2 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), #23 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony and Opinions of Richard T. Kaczkowski and James E. Pampinella filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2022 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/6/2022. Replies due by 5/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Mueller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #251 Notice (Other),,, filed by CertainTeed G ypsum, Inc., #250 Notice (Other), filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed, #252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Omnibus Daubert Motion and Exhibits Thereto, #251 Notice (Other),,, (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Omnibus Daubert Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ghrist Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Ghrist Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Ghrist Decl., #5 Exhibit 6 to Ghrist Decl., #6 Exhibit 8 to Ghrist Decl., #7 Exhibit 15 to Ghrist Decl., #8 Exhibit 16 to Ghrist Decl., #9 Exhibit 17 to Ghrist Decl., #10 Exhibit 18 to Ghrist Decl., #11 Exhibit 21 to Ghrist Decl., #12 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Omnibus Daubert Motion and Exhibits Thereto filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Omnibus Daubert Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ghrist Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 to Ghrist Decl., #4 Exhibit 6 to Ghrist Decl., #5 Exhibit 10 to Ghrist Decl., #6 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. of Motion and Omnibus Daubert Motion (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane E. Ghrist, #2 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), #23 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. of Motion and Daubert Motion To Exclude Certain Expert Opinion Testimony; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Mueller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2022 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/5/2022. Replies due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Mueller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/21/2022) Modified on 4/22/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 28 to Quirk Declaration filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2022 01:00 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/5/2022. Replies due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kellye R. Quirk, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28 (Filed Under Seal), #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2022 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/5/2022. Replies due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #11 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #12 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #13 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li)(Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2022, to 5/11/2022, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Dial-in: 888.684.8852. Access code: 1557087. Updated Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Settlement Conference held on 3/18/2022 via Zoom with clients. Discussions continue. Parties asked to provide joint update by 4/1 indicating whether and when they would like to schedule a further settlement communication with the court. (Not reported.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Settlement Conference set for 3/8/2022 to 3/18/2022, at 12:30 PM via Zoom meeting. No additional statements requested. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Settlement Conference held on 3/3/2022. No settlement. Discussion continues to further Zoom meeting on 3/8/2022 in the 01:00 to 4:00 PM window, to be confirmed by further emails. For CertainTeed: Matthew Moore and Rebecca Rabenstein, with client Adam Keser. For PABCO: Jason Mueller and Ragesh Tangri, with clients Daniel Yanagihara, Phil Bonnell, Ryan Lucchetti. (Not recorded.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2022)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: EMAIL RECEIVED. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/11/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER on Fact Discovery Disputes. Re: ECF #222 , #223 , #224 , #225 , #226 , #227 , and #228 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/10/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER SETTING DATES FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL. Jury Trial set for 9/6/2022. Trial days will be 9:30 AM to 4:30 PM. San Jose courtroom is to be determined. Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2022, at 11:00 AM by Zoom. Pretrial conference filings, including motions in limine: 8/10/2022. Oppositions to motions in limine: 8/17/2022. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/9/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER RE: EMAIL RECEIVED. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/9/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/21/22, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #232 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 2/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2022. (Related documents(s) #232 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Joint Supplemental Report on Trial Date by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and Pabco Building Products, LLC. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/28/2022) Modified on 1/31/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING #231 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Joint Statement). Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/28/2022)Transcriber: Belle Ball Modified on 1/28/2022 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement Regarding Pacific Coast's Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Testimony on SilentFX Sales and Production of Documents Used to Refresh Witnesses Memory (ECF No. 227) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Version of Joint Statement)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/27/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER; AND DISCOVERY ORDER. See order for deadlines. #206 Defendant's request for email discovery: DENIED. #221 Plaintiff's request to quash subpoena to certain third parties: GRANTED. #194 Motion to File Under Seal: DENIED. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2022, at 10:30 AM by Zoom meeting. Exchanged settlement briefs must be lodged (not filed) 1 week in advance. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/21/2022. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2022. Pretrial and Jury Trial to be set. #210 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is granted; #220 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is denied. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2022, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2022. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Matthew Moore, Adam Greenfield, Richard Frenkel. Attorneys for Defendants: Jason Mueller, Ragesh Tangri. AT&T Recording: 10:04am - 10:50am. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Statement JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PACIFIC COASTS MOTION COMPEL RULE 30(B)(6) TESTIMONY ON TECHNICAL TOPICS by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Statement JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PACIFIC COASTS MOTION TO COMPEL RULE 30(B)(6) TESTIMONY ON SILENTFX SALES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS USED TO REFRESH WITNESSES MEMORY by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Statement JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PACIFIC COASTS MOTION COMPEL RULE 30(B)(6) TESTIMONY ON TOPIC NOS. 1-2, 11-12, AND 49 by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Statement JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PACIFIC COASTS MOTION TO COMPEL RULE 30(B)(6) TESTIMONY ON TOPICS 4, 9, 13, 20, AND 68 by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Statement JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PACIFIC COASTS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER INSPECTION OF CERTAINTEEDS FACILITIES by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Statement (Joint) Regarding CertainTeed's Motion to Strike Defendants' Untimely Disclosures and Discovery Responses by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Statement (Joint) Regarding CertainTeed's Motion to Strike Defendants' Untimely Damages Contentions by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Statement (Joint) Regarding CertainTeed's Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corp., Angie Day Marcelli, and Clare Zegarelli by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion to Extend Fact Discovery (Dkt. 210) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Extend Fact Discovery, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/17/2022)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 REPLY (re #210 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #210 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca L. Rabenstein, #2 Exhibit A to Rabenstein Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Rabenstein Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Rabenstein Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Rabenstein Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Rabenstein Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Rabenstein Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Rabenstein Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Rabenstein Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Rabenstein Decl., #11 Exhibit J to Rabenstein Decl., #12 Exhibit K to Rabenstein Decl., #13 Exhibit L to Rabenstein Decl., #14 Exhibit M to Rabenstein Decl., #15 Exhibit N to Rabenstein Decl., #16 Exhibit O to Rabenstein Decl., #17 Exhibit P to Rabenstein Decl.)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/11/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #205 Answer to to CounterClaim, Counterclaim byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING Case Management Conference to 1/21/2022, at 09:30 AM by telephone. Dial in: 888.684.8852. Access code: 1557087. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Case Management Conference for 1/19/2022, at 10:00 AM by telephone, with joint update due by 1/12/2022. Discovery referral to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen is terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/2022. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #211 Stipulation for Expedited Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' Motion to Extend the Close of Fact Discovery. (ked, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Expedited Briefing Schedule re #210 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/5/2022) Modified on 1/6/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Hopkins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Heins (Heins, Michael) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 RESPONSE re 202 Clerk's Notice Regarding Location Change for Judge Jon S. Tigar,,,, by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE re 202 Clerk's Notice Regarding Location Change for Judge Jon S. Tigar,,,, Consent to Magistrate Judge Cousins by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 JOINT Statement Regarding CertainTeed's Refusal to Engage In Email Discovery by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2021) Modified on 1/3/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #82 Answer to Complaint,, Answer to Counterclaim,,, (Refiled [Docket 101]), Amended COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION OF NO LITERAL INFRINGEMENT REGARDING U.S. PATENT NOS. 10,125,492 AND 10,132,076 BASED ON THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OF "INNER SURFACE" AND "INNER UNCLAD SURFACE" filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 12/23/2021) Modified on 12/27/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 REPLY (re #194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal To Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 You are receiving this Notice because this case has been assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. On December 13, 2021, Judge Koh was confirmed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The parties to this action are instructed to meet and confer to determine if collectively they will consent to transfer of this case to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. On or before January 5, 2022, each party must file either (1) written consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge or (2) a request for reassignment of this case to a district judge. The parties may consent to the jurisdiction of a specific Magistrate Judge regardless of the division of the Court to which that Judge is assigned. In the event that the parties decline consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will be randomly reassigned to a district judge who likely will not be resident in the San Jose division of the Court. ON BEHALF OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE, Richard Seeborg, Chief Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal To Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 JOINT SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and Pabco Building Products, LLC. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/13/2021) Modified on 12/14/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part #137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ked, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2021)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Hopkins (Hopkins, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal To Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed - Defendants/Counterclaimants' Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment [SEALED] (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS' ANSWER to Amended Complaint FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal To Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Defendants/Counterclaimants' Answer [PUBLIC], #4 Defendants/Counterclaimants' Answer [SEALED])(Li, Joyce) (Filed on 12/6/2021).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Settlement Conference held on 12/6/2021. Discussions continue. Potential dates offered for next SC: 3/3, 3/10 or 3/18. Attorneys for CertainTeed Gypsum: Matthew Moore, Rebecca Rabenstein. Attorneys for Pacific Coast Building Products: Jason Mueller, Ragesh Tangri. (Not reported.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jason Mueller) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16690305.) filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Mueller, Jason) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/2/2021. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #191 Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 12/8/2021 to 3/9/2022 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/2/2022. (ked, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [Proposed] Order filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and Pabco Building Products, LLC. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/1/2021) Modified on 12/2/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. (Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Settlement Conference held on 11/22/2021. Discussions continue to 12/6/2021, at 10:00 AM via Zoom Attorneys for CertainTeed Gypsum: Matthew Moore, Adam Keser. Attorneys for Pacific Coast Building Products: Jason Mueller, Ragesh Tangri. (Not reported.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/22/2021)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #127 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Further Settlement Conference for 11/22/2021, at 09:30 AM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Updated settlement conference statements due by 11/16/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc Please click subheading +Join Non-Public Hearings.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING OCTOBER 14, 2021 HEARING on #127 MOTION to Dismiss in Part CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Matter to be determined on the papers without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Order on #183 Joint Discovery Statement re Pacific Coast's Responses to Requests for Admissions. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/1/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Renewed Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute as to Pacific Coast's Responses to Requests for Admission by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC and Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER CONSTRUING DISPUTED TERMS OF PATENT NOS. 10,125,492 AND 10,132,076 AND CORRECTING TERM OF PATENT NO. 10,132,076. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/16/2021. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE TO CERTAINTEED'S SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF re #175 Response ( Non Motion ), by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 9/8/2021) Modified on 9/9/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting Defendants' Motion #177 to File Supplemental Brief and Denying Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/17/21, before Judge Susan van Keulen. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2021. (Related documents(s) #168 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/28/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #177 MOTION to Strike CertainTeed's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief or Authorize Pacific Coast's Supplemental Briefing ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION to Strike CertainTeed's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief or Authorize Pacific Coast's Supplemental Briefing filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/8/2021. Replies due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Transcript of Remote Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 8/19/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Ana Dub, RDR, RMR, CRR, CSR No. 7445, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #171 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2021. (Related documents(s) #171 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 RESPONSE re 170 Claims Construction / Markman Hearing,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, (Supplemental Response to Court's Questions at Claim Construction Hearing Regarding Anchor Wall) by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/19/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/19/21 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/20/2021) To be refiled selecting Court Reporter Ana Dub. Modified on 8/20/2021 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #159 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/19/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 8/19/2021 from 1:31 pm - 3:10 pm; 3:23 pm - 3:50 pm (2 hours, 6 minutes). The Court took the parties' arguments under submission. The Court also held a Further Case Management Conference during the Markman hearing. #169 Case Management Order memorializes the relevant information and deadlines from the Conference. Total Time in Court: 2 hours, 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Matt Moore, Adam Greenfield, Reba Rabenstein, and Adam Keser. Defendants' Attorneys: Timothy Saulsbury and Ragesh Tangri. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/19/2021. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/17/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/18/2021) Transcriber: Belle Ball. Modified on 8/18/2021 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re #163 Joint Discovery Submission. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/17/2021. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing re #163 held on 8/17/2021 via Zoom.All parties appeared via Zoom. Court to issue short order.Total Time in Court: 10:00-10:40am (40 mins). Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Reba Rabenstein and Adam Greenfield. Defendant Attorney: Timothy Saulsbury and Joyce Li. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Discovery Hearing set for 8/17/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of c ounsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 8/16/21 at 4:30PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. The re is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING AUGUST 19, 2021 CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING. The August 19, 2021 Claims Construction Hearing remains as set at 1:30 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar remotely. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Court Appearances: Advanced no tice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at lhkcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, August 16, 2021 at 5:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-on ly entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) Re: Dkt. 161 Order by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #160 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ON #158 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/9/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16244743.) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Quirk, Kellye) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #154 Discovery Order filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Responses due by 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca L. Rabenstein, #2 Exhibit 1 of Rabenstein Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 of Rabenstein Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 of Rabenstein Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 of Rabenstein Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 of Rabenstein Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 of Rabenstein Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 of Rabenstein Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Statement / Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute as to Defendants' Deficient Privilege Log by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Richard Gregory Frenkel (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Statement re #155 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #144 Statement, Regarding Discovery Dispute as to CertainTeed's Redactions of Produced Documents by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying #142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/14/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order on #146 , #151 Discovery Disputes. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/14/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Stipulation re Protocol for Discovery Submissions. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/14/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #150 Discovery Order filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Statement (Joint - Regarding Discovery Dispute) by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER RE #144 , #145 DISCOVERY DISPUTE AS TO CERTAINTEED'S PRIVILEGE LOG AND REDACTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/6/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY (re #127 MOTION to Dismiss in Part CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pacific Coast's Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute and Associated Exhibits ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-2-21, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #135 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2021. (Related documents(s) #135 ) (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Statement (Joint) Regarding Discovery as to Defendants' Responses to Requests for Admission by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 RESPONSE re #144 Statement, Regarding Discovery Dispute as to CertainTeed's Privilege Redactions in Produced Documents by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute as to CertainTeed's Redactions of Produced Documents by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Redacted Version))(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pacific Coast's Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute and Associated Exhibits of Under Seal versions of Pacific Coast's Statement and the associated exhibits (Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pacific Coast's Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute and Associated Exhibits filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Eric C. Wiener, #2 Proposed Order granting Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 redacted version of Pacific Coast's Statement re Discovery Dispute, #4 unredacted version of Pacific Coast's Statement re Discovery Dispute, #5 unredacted version of Exhibit A to Pacific Coast's Statement, #6 redacted version of Exhibit B to Pacific Coast's Statement, #7 unredacted version of Exhibit B to Pacific Coast's Statement)(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #127 MOTION to Dismiss in Part CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley N. Finger, #2 Exhibit 1 to Finger Decl.)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of James Dimitrakopoulos, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Version of ECF No. 137-4, #4 Exhibit C - Redacted Version of ECF No. 137-6)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE re #122 Response ( Non Motion ),,, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. and Pabco Building Products, LLC's Reply Claim Construction Brief by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Loyce C. Li)(Li, Joyce) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Li, Joyce) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric C. Wiener, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Pacific Coast's Reply Claim Construction Brief, #4 Unredacted version of Pacific Coast's Reply Claim Construction Brief, #5 Redacted version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #6 Unredacted version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joyce C. Li)(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/02/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/02/2021 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ERRATA re #122 Response ( Non Motion ),,, - Notice of Errata to [122-1] Declaration of Rebecca L. Rabenstein in Support of Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 EXHIBITS re #122 Response ( Non Motion ),,, - Public Refiling of CertainTeed's Exhibit 17 to the Rabenstein Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Related document(s) #122 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re #120 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Document Under Seal (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom videoconference on 6/2/2021 from 2:49 PM - 3:15 PM (26 minutes). #130 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. For Plaintiff: Matt Moore, Reba Rabenstein, Rick Frenkel, and Adam Keser. For Defendants: Ragesh Tangri and Tim Saulsbury. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Case Management Order; Referral to Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/2/2021. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #128 Stipulation for Extension of Time.(lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time re: #127 Motion to Dismiss Briefing filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss in Part CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/11/2021. Replies due by 6/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce C. Li, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(Li, Joyce) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Unredacted Version of Dkt. 113) against Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Associated Document)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice #112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [Proposed] Order filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/27/2021. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE re #111 Brief, by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca L. Rabenstein, #2 Exhibit 1 to Rabenstein Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Rabenstein Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Rabenstein Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Rabenstein Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Rabenstein Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Rabenstein Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Rabenstein Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Rabenstein Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Rabenstein Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 to Rabenstein Decl., #12 Exhibit 11 to Rabenstein Decl., #13 Exhibit 12 to Rabenstein Decl., #14 Exhibit 13 to Rabenstein Decl., #15 Exhibit 14 to Rabenstein Decl., #16 Exhibit 15 to Rabenstein Decl., #17 Exhibit 16 to Rabenstein Decl., #18 Exhibit 17 to Rabenstein Decl., #19 Exhibit 18 to Rabenstein Decl., #20 Exhibit 19 to Rabenstein Decl.)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM JULY 28, 2021 TO JUNE 2, 2021. Pursuant to this notice, the Further Case Management Conference set for July 28, 2021 is ADVANCED to June 2, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar remotely.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https:/ /www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to make an appearance at the Conference. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at lhkcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 28, 2021 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only en try generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Settlement Conference held on 5/24/2021. No settlement. No further conferences scheduled. Attorney for CertainTeed Gypsum: Matthew Moore. Attorneys for Pacific Coast Building Products: Jason Mueller, Ragesh Tangri. (Not reported.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.(lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric C. Wiener in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time for Defendants' Reply Claim Construction Brief, #2 Proposed Order Modifying Case Management Order DI 84)(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Further Settlement Conference for 5/20/2021, at 03:00 PM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc Please click subheading +Join Non-Public Hearings.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Associated Document)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Amended Complaint, #5 Redacted Version of Redline of Complaint and Amended Complaint, #6 Unredacted Version of Redline of Complaint and Amended Complaint)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy C. Saulsbury)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 5/11/2021) Modified text on 5/12/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order on #107 Joint Discovery Submission. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit chart of rulings)(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #109 Order: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 5/5/2021 to 7/28/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2021. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order Continuing Case Management Conference; Referral to Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 04/28/2021. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute as to CertainTeed's Responses to Requests for Admission (Joint) by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND PREHEARING STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #101 Answer to to CounterClaim,, Counterclaim, byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Settlement Conference held on 4/20/2021. Discussion continues. Attorney for CertainTeed Gypsum: Matthew Moore. Attorneys for Pacific Coast Building Products: Jason Mueller, Ragesh Tangri. (Not recorded.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Order Granting #29 with Leave to Amend Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Inequitable Conduct Claims. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 04/14/2021. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Counterclaims for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity of Unasserted Claims (Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #82 Answer to Complaint,, Answer to Counterclaim,,, , Counter COUNTERCLAIM (Amended) against Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. of Filing Its Answer and Amended Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report Regarding Covenant Not to Sue by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY (re #93 MOTION to Dismiss CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Counterclaims for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity of Unasserted Claims ) filed byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric C. Wiener, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Eric C. Wiener)(Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #93 MOTION to Dismiss CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Counterclaims for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity of Unasserted Claims ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley N. Finger, #2 Exhibit 1 to Finger Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Finger Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Finger Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Finger Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Finger Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Finger Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Finger Decl.)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REGARDING #91 #95 DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/19/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Joint Statement Regarding Order Re Joint Discovery Dispute Statement re #92 Discovery Order by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/11/2021) Modified text on 3/12/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. The hearing on #93 MOTION to Dismiss CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Counterclaims for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity of Unasserted Claims is CONTINUED from April 8, 2021 to July 8, 2021 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, California, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. The April 8, 2021 hearing date was not cleared with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to filing. Please see Judge Lucy H. Koh's Scheduling Notes at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.'s Counterclaims for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity of Unasserted Claims filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/23/2021. Replies due by 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy C. Saulsbury, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Timothy C. Saulsbury, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Timothy C. Saulsbury, #4 Proposed Order)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE STATEMENT. Further materials due by 3/11/2021 at noon. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/8/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Statement (Joint) Regarding Discovery Dispute as to Defendants' Interrogatory and Request for Admission Responses by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Further Settlement Conference to 4/20/2021, at 09:30 AM, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Updated settlement conference statements are due 4/13/2021. This proceeding will be held via Zoom meeting. Counsel may access the meeting information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc Please click the subheading "Join Non-Public Hearings." General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (Joint) of Narrowing of Issues in Pending Motion to Dismiss (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FEBRUARY 25, 2021 HEARING on #29 MOTION to Dismiss. Matter to be determined on the papers without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM , Counter COUNTERCLAIM to Defendant's Counterclaims against CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Further Settlement Conference. Please take notice a Settlement Conference is scheduled for 3/30/2021, at 09:30 AM, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Updated settlement conference statements are due 3/23/2021. This proceeding will be held via Zoom meeting.Counsel may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/nc Please click the subheading "Join Non-Public Hearings.& quot;General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Hearings per #84 Case Management Order:Further Case Management Conference set for May 5, 2021 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Claim Construction Hearing set for June 24, 2021 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for January 6, 2022 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Final Pretrial Conference set for March 10, 2022 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial (5 days) set for April 4, 2022 at 9:00 AM each day in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #81 Motion to Amend/Correct as Moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Case Management Order; Referral to Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 02/09/2021. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , ANSWER to Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM One through Five against CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5 to Answer, #2 Exhibit A-G to Exhibits 4-5)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Amend/Correct #53 Order (Unopposed) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Responses due by 2/12/2021. Replies due by 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #79 Stipulated Protective Order. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Protective Order filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order re #75 Discovery Dispute as to Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/26/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. re #72 Order on Discovery Letter Brief NOTICE OF RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute as to Protective Order by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Li, Joyce) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER on #65 , #70 Discovery Disputes. Signed by Susan van Keulen on 1/21/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Motion To Compel Hearing held on 1/21/2021 via Zoom.Court to issue short order.Total Time in Court: 1:31-2:23pm (52 minutes). Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez via Zoom. Plaintiff Attorney: Reba Rabenstein and Rick Frenkel via Zoom. Defendant Attorney: Joyce Li and Tim Saulsbury via Zoom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Statement re #64 Statement, #65 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute as to Pacific Coast's Discovery Responses (Joint Supplement Regarding Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute as to Defendants' Discovery Responses) by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CLERK'S NOTICEConference Call held 1/15/21 with all counsel in re preparation for motion to compel. Motion to Compel Hearing re Dkt. #65 set for 1/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.c and.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM One through Five against CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. byPabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibits A-G)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Christopher Wiener (Wiener, Eric) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Annie A Lee (Lee, Annie) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute as to Pacific Coast's Discovery Responses filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Defendants' Proposed Order, #7 Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15380702.) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Finger, Ashley) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Statement of Recent Decision by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Responding to Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/23/2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REQUEST for Clarification of Case Management Order #53 by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 10/20/2020) Modified text on 10/21/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 **CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING ON #29 MOTION TO DISMISS** Pursuant to this notice, a hearing on #29 MOTION to Dismiss is SET for Thursday, February 25, 2021 at 1:30 PM before the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #56 MOTION (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/20 20)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Reply In Support Of #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/10/2019. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 10/14/2020) Modified on 10/15/2020. Incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Victoria L. Weatherford filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Replies due by 10/23/2020. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce C Li (Li, Joyce) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/02/2020. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #53 Case Management Order:Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2021; Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2021 02:00 PM; Dispositive Motion due by 5/19/2021; Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 01:30 PM Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2021 01:30 PM;Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 09:00 AM (5 days). Jury Trial dates:10/19,10/22,10/25,10/26/2021 09:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 **CLERK'S NOTICE** Pursuant to this notice, a Case Management Conference is set for October 7, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7 days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh, and refer to any special procedures in light of the COVID-19 pandemic: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (Joint) re: Federal Circuit Mandate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #46 Order of Decision of U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney..(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (UNOPPOSED) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. (Jin, Hwa young) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/23/19. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #38 Administrative Motion.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #38 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines re #37 Order on Stipulation ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Request for Judicial Notice re #41 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rebecca Faulk, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants Preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Patent and Trademark Assignment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Patent Assignment Abstract of Title regarding U.S. Patent No. 10,125,492, #5 Exhibit 5 - Patent Assignment Abstract of Title regarding U.S. Patent No. 10,132,076, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ex 9 to Rabenstein Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Ex 10 to Rabenstein Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 - Ex 11 to Rabenstein Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 - Ex 12 to Rabenstein Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ex 13 to Rabenstein Declaration)(Related document(s) #41 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Greenfield, Adam) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines re #37 Order on Stipulation filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Responses due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy C. Saulsbury, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Timothy C. Saulsbury, #3 Proposed Order)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #36 Stipulation for Order Changing Time.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Richard G. Frenkel, #2 Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2019)
April 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Hwa Young Jin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13275542.) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Jin, Hwa young) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Adam Greenfield ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13275491.) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Greenfield, Adam) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Elizabeth Ghrist (Ghrist, Diane) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/29/2019. Replies due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Proposed Order)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Leigh Weatherford (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ragesh K. Tangri (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Daralyn J. Durie (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Chen Saulsbury (Saulsbury, Timothy) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Per #19 Related Case Order, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for May 29, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Case Reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen re #19 . Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019) Modified on 3/13/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/12/19. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Reminder; Proper office is Oakland, not San Jose. All future documents should reflect the correct office. [err201] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No f urther action is necessary. Re: #17 Certificate of Service filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc., #18 Certificate of Service filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re Case No. 5:17-01116-LHK (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #14 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. re #14 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. Pabco Building Products, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019; Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/25/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Rebecca L. Rabenstein (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-13094042) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (Rabenstein, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Matthew J. Moore (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-13093913) filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (Moore, Matthew) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc... (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-13 by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Pabco Building Products, LLC, Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13092956.). Filed by CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc. v. Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CertainTeed Gypsum, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Gregory Frenkel
Represented By: Matthew Moore
Represented By: Rebecca Lynn Rabenstein
Represented By: Adam Michael Greenfield
Represented By: Ashley Finger
Represented By: Diane Elizabeth Ghrist
Represented By: Hwa young Jin
Represented By: Kellye Renea Quirk
Represented By: Sami K. Al-Marzoog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.
Represented By: Annie A Lee
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Eric Christopher Wiener
Represented By: Jason Erik Mueller
Represented By: Joyce C Li
Represented By: Michael K Heins
Represented By: Michael James Hopkins
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Represented By: Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Represented By: Victoria Leigh Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Pabco Building Products, LLC
Represented By: Annie A Lee
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Eric Christopher Wiener
Represented By: Jason Erik Mueller
Represented By: Joyce C Li
Represented By: Michael K Heins
Represented By: Michael James Hopkins
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Represented By: Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Represented By: Victoria Leigh Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?