Kasik, Jr. et al v. United States Postal Service (USPS)

Plaintiff: Martin A. Kasik, Jr. and Sharon K. Kasik
Defendant: United States Postal Service (USPS)
Case Number: 5:2019cv01157
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #17 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing from May 16, 2019 to June 27, 2019 filed by United States Postal Service (USPS). (Scharf, James) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMartin A. Kasik, Jr.. (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Defendant's Motions to Vacate Default Judgment and Writ of Possession, and to Dismiss Action ) filed byMartin A. Kasik, Jr.. (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Remand , #11 MOTION to Remand , #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Defendant's Motions to Vacate Default Judgment and Writ of Possession, and to Dismiss Action ) (Federal Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand & Reply in support of Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) filed byUnited States Postal Service (USPS). (Scharf, James) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Defendant's Motions to Vacate Default Judgment and Writ of Possession, and to Dismiss Action ) filed bySharon K. Kasik. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Sharon K. Kasik. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/2/2019. Replies due by 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand filed by Sharon K. Kasik. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/1/2019. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Defendant's Motions to Vacate Default Judgment and Writ of Possession, and to Dismiss Action ) filed bySharon K. Kasik. (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Defendant's Motions to Vacate Default Judgment and Writ of Possession, and to Dismiss Action filed by United States Postal Service (USPS). Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/22/2019. Replies due by 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. Scharf)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/12/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior.The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin A. Kasik, Jr... (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Postal Service (USPS) re: Removal Documents (Scharf, James) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/15/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV341986. (). Filed byUnited States Postal Service (USPS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 3/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kasik, Jr. et al v. United States Postal Service (USPS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin A. Kasik, Jr.
Represented By: Todd Bennett Rothbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon K. Kasik
Represented By: Todd Bennett Rothbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service (USPS)
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?