Clancy v. Kane

Plaintiff: Norman Clancy
Defendant: William Kane
Case Number: 5:2019cv01509
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and Order Granting Admission (Civil Local Rule 11-3) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13482686.) filed by William Kane. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ranekouhi, Gouya) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ranekouhi, Gouya) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byWilliam Kane. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Amended), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ranekouhi, Gouya) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Judge Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is SET for Wednesday, August 7, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Hearing on Defendants #5 Motion to Dismiss is SET for Thursday, October 3, 2019 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byNorman Clancy. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman Clancy. William Kane served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Kane re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Ranekouhi, Gouya) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William Kane.. (Ranekouhi, Gouya) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/21/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Kane. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Ranekouhi, Gouya) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/22/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William Kane. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Kane (Filing fee $ 400-PAID.). Filed by Norman Clancy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clancy v. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kane
Represented By: Gouya Askari Ranekouhi
Represented By: Jamie L Filipovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?