Chen v. Cyrus Amax Minerals Company et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Chen
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Cyrus Amax Minerals Company, Johnson & Johnson and Cyrus Amax Minerals Company doing business as American Talc Company doing business as Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. doing business as Charles Mathieu Inc. doing business as Sierra Talc Company doing business as United Talc Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv01523
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen denying #22 Motion to Relate Case. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings re #28 Amended Order. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Amended ORDER terminating dismissed defendants and reassigning case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings re #26 Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Terminating Dismissed Defendants and Reassigning Case Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/22/2019. The clerk shall terminate Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company and Imerys Talc America, Inc. as parties.The case shall be reassigned to a Magistrate Judge. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (PLEASE DISREGARD - ENTERED INCORRECTLY) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Ryan Chen of Lodging Plaintiff Rueyeh Chen's Response to Defendant Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Relating Cases (Oganesyan, Albert) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byRyan Chen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert Oganesyan, #2 Proposed Order)(Oganesyan, Albert) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION To Relate Cases filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romano, Julia) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Supplemental Notice of Pendency of Other Proceedings [L.R. 3-13] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #15 Notice (Other) Exhibit A to Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Cyrus Amax Minerals Company of Dismissal in Underlying State Court Action Prior to Federal Court Removal (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant's Cyrus Amax Minerals Company and Imerys Talc America, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Chen.. (Oganesyan, Albert) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Ryan Chen and Defendants Cyrus Amax Minerals Company and Imerys Talc America, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Imerys Talc America, Inc. of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Initial Documents Served By Removing Johnson & Johnson Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. Amendment to #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Amended Certification of Interested Entities). (Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. Amendment to #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Amended Disclosure Statement ). (Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Notice to State Court Clerk and Adverse Parties of Removal of Entire Action to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Corrected Certificates of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal of Entire Action; Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Certificate of Service to the Declaration of Amy Zumsteg in Support of Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Entire Action; Demand for Jury Trial; Exhibits A - W, #3 Exhibit C - Corrected Certificate of Service to Defendant Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Disclosure Statement and Certification as to Interested Parties, #4 Exhibit D - Corrected Certificate of Service to Civil Cover Sheet)(Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/16/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County. Their case number is 18CV336661. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13197407). Filed byJohnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Declaration of Amy Zumsteg)(Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Certification as to Interested Parties (Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. . (Calfo, Alexander) (Filed on 3/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Cyrus Amax Minerals Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Chen
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Bartlett
Represented By: Albert Oganesyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer J. Lee
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Gerard Calfo
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Jennifer J. Lee
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Gerard Calfo
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Amax Minerals Company doing business as American Talc Company doing business as Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. doing business as Charles Mathieu Inc. doing business as Sierra Talc Company doing business as United Talc Company
Represented By: Jennifer J. Lee
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?