Wills v. United Parcel Service (UPS), et al.
Plaintiff: Cynthia S Wills
Defendant: United Parcel Service (UPS), First Republic Bank and Hanson Bridgett, LLP
Case Number: 5:2019cv01819
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DISMISSING UPS FROM THIS CASE. Re: Dkt Nos. #7 , #10 , #14 . Wills may file an amended complaint against the Bank and Hanson Bridgett by 7/31/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 41 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2019 1:08:26 PM ]. File Size [ 13032 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:27:09 ]. (courtspeak).
June 26, 2019 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing held re: Motion to Dismiss filed by United Parcel Service #7 ; Motion to Dismiss filed by First Republic Bank #10 ; Motion to Dismiss filed by Hanson Bridgett, LLP #14 . Court takes motions under submission. Plaintiff: Cynthia Wills. Attorney for United Parcel Service: Alexandra Ward. Attorney for First Republic Bank: Mel Aranoff. Attorney for Hanson Bridgett LLP: Emily Charley. FTR Time: 1:08pm - 1:35pm. Time in Court: 27 minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Re: ECF #31 . The motions to dismiss remain scheduled for hearing on June 26 at 1:00 PM in San Jose federal courthouse courtroom 5. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Parcel Service (UPS) re #35 Reply to Opposition/Response, #34 Reply to Opposition/Response, Amended Certificate of Service (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim ) To Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byFirst Republic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Aranoff, Mel) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Parcel Service (UPS) re #35 Reply to Opposition/Response, #34 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY (re #31 MOTION to Remand ) Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byUnited Parcel Service (UPS). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand for Lack of Jurisdiction)(Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof ) In Support Of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byUnited Parcel Service (UPS). (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant from the Complaint and, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement ) filed byHanson Bridgett, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Charley, Emily) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 OBJECTIONS to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof by United Parcel Service (UPS), #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant from the Complaint and, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement by Hanson Bridgett, LLP, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by First Republic Bank by Cynthia S Wills. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Remand on Lack of Complete Diversity filed by Cynthia S Wills. Responses due by 7/1/2019. Replies due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cynthia S Wills. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/29/2019 1:06:13 PM ]. File Size [ 13192 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:27:29 ]. (courtspeak).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SUMMARIZING DEADLINES SET AT MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing held on 5/29/2019. Court continues briefing schedule: Plaintiff's opposition to motions to dismiss and motion to remand due 6/12/2019; Defendants' opposition to motion to remand and reply to oppositions due 6/19/2019. Hearing on Plaintiff's motion to remand and Defendants' motions to dismiss #7 #10 #14 are set for hearing 6/26/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, San Jose Courthouse. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2019. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:00 AM. Plaintiff: Cynthia Wills. Attorney for United Parcel Service: Alex Ward. Attorney for First Republic Bank: Mel Aranoff. Attorney for Hanson Bridgett LLP: Emily Charley. FTR Time: 1:06pm - 1:33pm. Time in Court: 27 minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 26 Declaration of Emily M. Charley in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Request for Conditions on Extension filed by Hanson Bridgett, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Charley, Emily) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 25 Response re #22 Objection Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Notice of Removal of Action byUnited Parcel Service (UPS). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Willey, #2 Exhibit A to Paul Willey Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Hanson Bridgett, LLP re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant from the Complaint and, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Charley, Emily) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by First Republic Bank re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Aranoff, Mel) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 22 OBJECTIONS to re #1 Notice of Removal, and Change of Address by Cynthia S Wills. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/19/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Parcel Service (UPS).. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Republic Bank re #17 Certificate of Interested Entities, #18 Certificate of Interested Entities, #16 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Aranoff, Mel) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Republic Bank (Aranoff, Mel) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by First Republic Bank identifying Corporate Parent First Republic Bank for First Republic Bank. (Aranoff, Mel) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Republic Bank.. (Aranoff, Mel) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hanson Bridgett, LLP re #13 Certificate of Interested Entities, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant from the Complaint and, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement, #11 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #12 Certificate of Interested Entities (Charley, Emily) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant from the Complaint and, Alternatively, for More Definite Statement filed by Hanson Bridgett, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 4/25/2019. Replies due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Charley, Emily) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanson Bridgett, LLP (Charley, Emily) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hanson Bridgett, LLP (Charley, Emily) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hanson Bridgett, LLP.. (Charley, Emily) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by First Republic Bank. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 4/25/2019. Replies due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Aranoff, Mel) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Parcel Service (UPS) re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof, #8 Request for Judicial Notice, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Judicial Notice re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed byUnited Parcel Service (UPS). (Related document(s) #7 ) (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by United Parcel Service (UPS). Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 4/25/2019. Replies due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Willey, #2 Exhibit A to Paul Willey Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Paul Willey Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Parcel Service (UPS) re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Parcel Service (UPS) re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Parcel Service (UPS) identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service Inc a Delaware Corporation for United Parcel Service (UPS). re #1 Notice of Removal, (Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Monterey. Their case number is 19CV000686. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13232244). Filed byUnited Parcel Service (UPS). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koltun, Gregory) (Filed on 4/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wills v. United Parcel Service (UPS), et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service (UPS)
Represented By: Gregory Bryant Koltun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: Mel Aranoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Bridgett, LLP
Represented By: Emily Charley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia S Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?