Quintero et al v. City of Santa Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Montoya, Mark Hemerbach, Desieire Quintero, Shannon Vudmuska, Santos Mendez, Juan Macedo, Michael Sweatt, Sunny Lopez, Crystal Olsson, Rafael Saldana, Food Not Bombs, Ross Camp Council of the Santa Cruz Homeless Union and Homeless United for Friendship and Freedom
Defendant: Susie O'Hara, Santa Cruz City Council, Martin Bernal, Andrew Mills, Tina Shull, City of Santa Cruz and Take Back Santa Cruz
Not Yet Classified: Alicia Kuhl
Case Number: 5:2019cv01898
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 55 Mail sent to Alicia Kuhl returned as undeliverable re #51 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,.(RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN -UNABLE TO FORWARD) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 54 Mail sent to Alicia Kuhl returned as undeliverable(RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN -UNABLE TO FORWARD) returned as undeliverable re #49 Order,. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 53 Mail sent to Alicia Kuhl returned as undeliverable (RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN -UNABLE TO FORWARD) returned as undeliverable re #46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 52 Mail sent to Alicia Kuhl returned as undeliverable (RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN -UNABLE TO FORWARD) re #45 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order granting #50 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/1/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Desieire Quintero. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ALL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/20/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Statement Regarding ADR (Peterson, Paul) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 47 LETTER dated 6/19/19 re: ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options we respectfully request that the Court vacate the July 10, 2019 Case Management Conference and all deadlines set forth Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines. (Dkt. No. 2). (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/19/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Plaintiff Desiere Quintero's #38 Request for transcripts. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2019. (NOTE: Application to proceed in forma pauperis and Order mailed to Plaintiff Desiere Quintero by AMK) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order denying #16 Application for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2019. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 44 Mail sent to Alicia Kuhl returned as undeliverable re #37 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis,.(RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN -UNABLE TO FORWARD) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 43 Mail sent to Santos Mendez returned as undelivered re #14 Order,.(RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 42 Mail sent to Rafael Saldana returned as undeliverable re #12 Order, #11 Order,. (RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 41 Mail sent to Rafael Saldana returned as undeliverable re #14 Order, (RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 40 Mail sent to Santos Mendez returned as undeliverable re #12 Order,,, #11 Order,. (RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Desieire Quintero. Appeal of Order on Motion for TRO #25 , Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, #37 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: #1 representation statement)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 38 REQUEST for Transcript and [Proposed] Order re #23 Motion Hearing, #22 Motion Hearing, filed by Desieire Quintero. Responses due by 6/25/2019. Replies due by 7/2/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying #28 Motion for Transcripts, and #33 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2019 Filing 36 USCA Case Number 19-16104 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Preliminary Injunction Appeal C.R. 3-3 for #32 Notice of Appeal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/29/2019 before Judge Edward J. Davila by City of Santa Cruz, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/26/2019 before Judge Edward J. Davila by City of Santa Cruz, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Alicia Kuhl (non-party). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Alicia Kuhl. Appeal of Order on Motion for TRO #25 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alicia Kuhl (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019) Modified on 5/28/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2019 Filing 30 Mail sent to Desieire Quintero, Rafael Saldana, Shannon Vudmuska, Juan Maccedo, Santos Mendez, returned as undeliverable re #6 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or Alternatively, to Quash Service of the Summons ) filed byCity of Santa Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 28 Erroneous MOTION for Transcripts and [Proposed] Order re #23 Motion Hearing, #22 Motion Hearing by Alicia Kuhl. (Attachments: #1 transcript order for 4/26/19, #2 transcript order for 4/29/19)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019) Modified text on 5/29/2019 ***correct event is motion. *** pursuant to SP Modified text on 6/7/2019 *** correct event is Erroneous Motion pursuant to BF.(cv, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2019 Filing 27 Opposition to Alicia Kuhl's Application for an #16 Order to Show Cause as to Why the City Should Not Be Held In Contempt by City of Santa Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF CITY OF SANTA CRUZ ASSISTANT TO THE CITY MANAGER SUSAN OHARA IN SUPPORT thereof #2 Declaration OF CITY OF SANTA CRUZ CHIEF OF POLICE ANDREW MILLS IN SUPPORT thereof, #3 Declaration OF CITY OF SANTA CRUZ DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY CATHERINE BRONSON IN SUPPORT thereof , #4 Certificate/Proof of Service (Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 5/9/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Rule 12b(6) filed by Take Back Santa Cruz. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Brereton, Brad) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/30/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, or Alternatively, to Quash Service of the Summons filed by City of Santa Cruz. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/14/2019. Replies due by 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Martin Bernal, #2 Declaration Declaration of Tina Shull, #3 Declaration Declaration of Susan O'Hara, #4 Declaration Declaration of Chief Andrew Mills, #5 Declaration Declaration of Anthony Condotti, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Hearing re #13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 4/29/2019. Testimony held and evidence entered. SEE ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.The Court finds the evidence before the Court suggests the likelihood of success has not been shown and finds no irreparable harm, the TRO is dissolved. Court to prepare the Order. Plaintiff Attorney: Anthony Prince(General Appearance),Alicia Kuhl(Homeless Advocate and Ross Camp Liaison),Crystal Olsson(Pro Se),Santos Mendez(Pro Se), Keith McHenry. Defendant Attorney: Reed Gallogly, Anthony Condotti. Total Time in Court:10:10am-12:05pm,1:06-1:33,3:13-6:00pm(Total:5Hrs.15Mins.) Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Attachment: Minute Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2019) (amkS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #1 Minute Order) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re #13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 4/26/2019. The parties agreed to appear before Magistrate Judge Cousins for a settlement conference. Parties attend settlement conference. Testimony held. Further Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Plaintiff Attorney: Anthony Prince(General Appearance),Alicia Kuhl,Michael Sweatt,Keith McHenry,Robert Norse. Defendant Attorney: Reed Gallogly,Catherine Bronson,Anthony Condotti,Paul Peterson. Total Time in Court:9:08-10:00am,4:42-5:06,5:12-6:00pm(1Hr.54Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Attachment: Minute Order. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties appear for Settlement Conference on 4/26/2019: No settlement; discussions continue; conference ended 4:24 PM. Parties ordered returned to Judge Davila. Attorney for Plaintiffs: Anthony Prince; Also present: Alicia Kuhl, Keith McHenry, Robert Norse, Michael Sweatt (Plaintiff). Attorneys for Defendants: Reed Gallogly, Catherine Bronson, Anthony Condotti, Paul Peterson. FTR Time: Not recorded. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Santa Cruz re #17 Exhibits,, #15 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Santa Cruz re #18 Exhibits, #17 Exhibits,, #15 Opposition/Response to Motion,, AMENDED (Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Received Exhibit N: Video on CD #17 14 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #18 Exhibits filed by City of Santa Cruz (cv, C OURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by City of Santa Cruz. (Related document(s) #17 , #15 ) (Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/25/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBITS re #15 Opposition/Response to Motion,, INDEX OF EXHIBITS TO CITY'S OPPOSITION filed byCity of Santa Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N Video on CD MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION , #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/25/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause filed by (non-party) Alicia Kuhl. Responses due by 5/9/2019. Replies due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byCity of Santa Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Anthony P. Condotti, #2 Declaration Declaration of Juan Becerra, #3 Declaration Declaration of Darius Mohsenin, #4 Declaration Declaration of Jason Hajduk, #5 Declaration Declaration of Donna Meyers, #6 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Mills, #7 Declaration Declaration of Susan O'Hara, #8 Declaration Declaration of Constance B. Sheehan, #9 Declaration Declaration of Michael Spadafora)(Bronson, Catherine) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. A Hearing on this Matter is Scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service AMENDED) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Supplemental and Urgent MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alicia Kuhl. (Attachments: #1 Order filed Superior Court County of Santa Cruz, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order TRO)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #12 Order: Responses due by 4/25/2019. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 4/26/2019 09:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Scheduling a Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order at 9:00 a.m. on April 26, 2019. Defendants shall File and Serve an Opposition, if any, on or Before Noon on April 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)(NOTE: Copy of Order with Certificate of Service Emailed to parties by AMK) ***ATTACHMENT #1 POSTED IN ERROR DISREGARD SEE ATTACHMENT #2 FOR CORRECT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/23/2019 (amkS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/23/2019 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Requiring Plaintiffs to Notify Defendants of Their Application for TRO and to File a Certificate of Service with the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/22/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Complaint,, filed by Alicia Kuhl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for TRO)(Related document(s) #1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019) Modified on 4/23/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by (non-party) Alicia Kuhl, Homeless Advocate and Ross Camp Liaison.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Take Back Santa Cruz. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: As it is impractical for all parties to make consent or declination decision to magistrate judge jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. section 636 before requested preliminary injunction is heard, Clerk is asked to randomly reassign case to District Court Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 **DISREGARD** CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/10/2019 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants c/o City Attorney for the City of Santa Cruz. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Under the 8th and 14th Amendment and Declarations against Martin Bernal, City of Santa Cruz, Andrew Mills, Susie O'Hara, Santa Cruz City Council, Tina Shull (Filing fee $ 400-Paid.). Filed by Vanessa Montoya, Santos Mendez, Desieire Quintero, Crystal Olsson, Michael Sweatt, Mark Hemerbach, Juan Macedo, Sunny Lopez, Shannon Vudmuska, Rafael Saldana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero et al v. City of Santa Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hemerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desieire Quintero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Vudmuska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Macedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sweatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunny Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Olsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food Not Bombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Camp Council of the Santa Cruz Homeless Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homeless United for Friendship and Freedom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Cruz
Represented By: Reed William Gallogly
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Take Back Santa Cruz
Represented By: Brad C Brereton
Represented By: Paul Douglas Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alicia Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?