Castro

Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Castro
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 5:2019cv01940
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury In Support of Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Manuel Castro. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown. Filed by Juan M. Castro (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/5/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SUA SPONTE GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Certificate of Funds due by 7/8/2019.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Manuel Castro. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/20/2019. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Manuel Castro. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filed by Juan Manuel Castro. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?