Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. ARB Food, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC and BR IP Holder, LLC
Defendant: Amit R. Bhardwaj, ARB Food, Inc. and Deepty Bhardwaj
Case Number: 5:2019cv02111
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC re #25 MOTION for Entry of Default , #26 Brief, (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to #25 Motion for Entry of Default. Responses due by 7/11/2019. Replies due by 7/18/2019. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 Brief re #25 MOTION for Entry of Default Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Judgment by Default filed byBaskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Gary Zullig, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC of Request for Default and Declaration of Jaemin Chang (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 23 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ARB FOOD, INC., AMIT R. BHARDWAJ, and DEEPTY BHARDWAJ. (Related documents(s) #22 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaemin Chang)(Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Craig R. Tractenberg, Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Craig Tractenberg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13333243.) filed by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC re #2 Complaint, Hand service on Deepty Bhardwaj (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC re #2 Complaint, Hand service on Amit Bhardwaj (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC re #2 Complaint, Hand service on ARB Food, Inc. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re:[1 9] Certificate of Service filed by DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, #17 Certificate of Service filed by DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, #18 Certificate of Service filed by DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 16 Refund Status re #13 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 Application for Refund re #2 Complaint,, Receipt Number 0971-13273288 duplicate charge by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 Refund Status re #9 Application for Refund, DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC.. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Refund re #2 Complaint,, Receipt Number 0971-13273288 duplicate charge; correct charge 0971-13273516 by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. for BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ARB Food, Inc., Amit R. Bhardwaj, Deepty Bhardwaj. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/19/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Complaint, filed by DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, BR IP Holder, LLC, Baski n-Robbins Franchising LLC The Complaint Should Always be Docket Number 1. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13273516.). Filed byBaskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, BR IP Holder, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/18/2019) Modified on 4/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet by BR IP Holder, LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC . (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. ARB Food, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit R. Bhardwaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARB Food, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepty Bhardwaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB Real Estate Assets I LLC
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: Craig R. Tractenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: Craig R. Tractenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder, LLC
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: Craig R. Tractenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?