Anguiano v. Mann Packing Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maria Anguiano
Defendant: Mann Packing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02133
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #17 Motion to Remand. The Clerk of the Court shall REMAND this case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Monterey and close the file. All other pending motions and hearings are TERMINATED and VACATED. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gavron, Max) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY (re #26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byMann Packing Co., Inc.. (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/25/2019 10:35:35 AM ]. File Size [ 13016 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:27:07 ]. (courtspeak).
June 25, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2019. re #17 MOTION to Remand. Matter taken under submission. Court to issue written order. FTR Time: 10:35-11:02. Plaintiff Attorney: Max Gavron. Defendant Attorney: Gayle Huxoll. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byMaria Anguiano. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Mann Packing Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 6/24/2019. Replies due by 7/1/2019. (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMaria Anguiano. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMann Packing Co., Inc.. (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 Statement re #21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Mann Packing Co., Inc.. (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND by Maria Anguiano. (Gavron, Max) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #14 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion to Remand. 6/25/2019 Hearing re #14 Motion to Dismiss is hereby VACATED. Parties' statements re impact of First Amended Complaint on #17 Motion to Remand due by 5/28/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byMaria Anguiano. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 First Amended Class Action Complaint against Mann Packing Co., Inc. Filed by Maria Anguiano. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/21/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice that the 6/18/2019 Motion Hearing as to #14 Motion to Dismiss is hereby CONTINUED to 6/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand filed by Maria Anguiano. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 5/31/2019. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice that the 6/11/2019 hearing as to #14 Motion to Dismiss is hereby CONTINUED to 6/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mann Packing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/7/2019 linking entry to document #14 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mann Packing Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maria Anguiano.. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mann Packing Co., Inc... (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Huxoll). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13308363.) filed by Mann Packing Co., Inc.. (Huxoll, Gaye) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mann Packing Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Del Monte Fresh Produce Company, Corporate Parent Del Monte Fresh Produce N.A. Inc. for Mann Packing Co., Inc.. (Maltzman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13289272.) filed by Mann Packing Co., Inc.. (Tein, Michael) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Mann Packing Co., Inc.. (Maltzman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mann Packing Co., Inc. of Filing Proof of Service of Declaration of Paul Eads in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Maltzman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/20/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/ 16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Paul Eads in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byMann Packing Co., Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Maltzman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV001178. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13276221). Filed byMann Packing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maltzman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anguiano v. Mann Packing Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Anguiano
Represented By: Nicholas Rosenthal
Represented By: Max William Gavron
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Agnew
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann Packing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ross Tein
Represented By: Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman
Represented By: Gaye Lon Huxoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?