U.S. Bank National Association v. Sepehry-Fard

Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Fareed Sepehry-Fard
Cross Defendant: William A. Aspinwall, Mark Joseph Kenney, Georgia Ku, Joseph W Guzzetta, Rebecca Fleming, Adam N. Barasch, Severson & Werson APC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Bernard J Kornberg and Amar R. Patel
Case Number: 5:2019cv02181
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to an order remanding case, transmitted are:Certified original and one copy of this letter, Certified copy of docket entries, Certified copy of Remand Order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Fareed Sepehry-Fard. (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Sepehry-Fard, Fareed) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Remanding Case to Santa Clara County Superior Court Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/25/2019. The Clerk shall provide a copy of this Order to the Santa Clara County Superior Court as expeditiously as possible. The Clerk shall close the file. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by U.S. Bank National Association re Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Guzzetta, Joseph) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of by Fareed Sepehry-Fard re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Inter Criminal Court in Hague Netherlands, #2 Inter Criminal Court in Hague Netherlands, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Granting #6 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (NOTE: Order and Certificate of Service sent via email to ALL parties by AMK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/24/2019 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Remanded Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. Defendant Mr. Sepehry-Fard must file a brief no later than 8:00 a.m. P.D.T. on Thursday, April 25, 2019 showing why this matter should not be remanded to the state court. Plaintiff shall have until 1:00 p.m. P.D.T. on Thursday, April 25, 2019 to respond. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF). (NOTE: Copy of Order and Certificate of Service sent via email to ALL parties by AMK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/24/2019 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Fareed Sepehry-Fard. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William A. Aspinwall, Adam N. Barasch, Rebecca Fleming, Joseph W Guzzetta, Mark Joseph Kenney, Bernard J Kornberg, Georgia Ku, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Amar R. Patel, Severson & Werson APC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 CROSSCLAIM (summons issued) against Amar R. Patel, Joseph W Guzzetta, Bernard J Kornberg, Mark Joseph Kenney, Adam N. Barasch, William A. Aspinwall, Severson & Werson APC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Rebecca Fleming, Georgia Ku. Filed byFareed Sepehry-Fard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities / Notice to agent is Notice to principle and Notice to Principle is Notice to Agent - Lucy H. Koh, Edward J. Davila, Beth Labson Freeman, Mariano Florentino Cuellar, Superior Court of the State of California, County of Santa Clara by Fareed Sepehry-Fard (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fareed Sepehry-Fard.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 17cv314286. ( Filing fee $400 ). Filed byFareed Sepehry-Fard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- COMPLAINT for unlawful Detainer, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Sepehry-Fard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Joseph W. Guzzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: William A. Aspinwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Mark Joseph Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Georgia Ku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Joseph W Guzzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Rebecca Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Adam N. Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Severson & Werson APC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Bernard J Kornberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Amar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fareed Sepehry-Fard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?