Deluna v. Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Plaintiff: Raul Deluna
Defendant: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv02514
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING set for 7/3/2019 at 01:00 PM re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #15 and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 . The Court finds the motions suitable for decision without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Remand ) filed byRaul Deluna. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike ) filed byAramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING RE: Motion to Remand filed by Raul Deluna #18 . Motion will be heard with Aramark's Motion to Dismiss #15 set for 7/3/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. No change in briefing schedule. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 ERRATA re #17 Notice of Appearance by Raul Deluna. (Hyun, Dennis) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike ) filed byRaul Deluna. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand filed by Raul Deluna. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/21/2019. Replies due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 *filing error see dkt #20 for corrections on NOTICE of Appearance * by Dennis Sangwon Hyun (Hyun, Dennis) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/11/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike filed byAramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Cho, Karen) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike filed by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/7/2019. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cho, Karen) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raul Deluna.. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC.. (Friedman, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/4/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Amended Document (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Resond to First Amended Complaint (L.R. 6-1(A)) filed by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Nicole Friedman (Friedman, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Yoonjung Cho (Cho, Karen) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, [Amended Civil Cover Sheet]. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Aramark Intermediate Holdco Corporation, Corporate Parent Aramark Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Aramark for Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Aramark Intermediate Holdco Corporation, Corporate Parent Aramark Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Aramark for Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Benito Superior Court. Their case number is CU-19-00059. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13335491). Filed byAramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Declaration of Charles Kellogg in Support of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 5/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deluna v. Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Rebecca Nicole Friedman
Represented By: Karen Yoonjung Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Deluna
Represented By: Max William Gavron
Represented By: Dennis Sangwon Hyun
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?