RingCentral, Inc. v. John Does 1-19
Plaintiff: RingCentral, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-19
Case Number: 5:2019cv02626
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Second Ex Parte Application For Leave to Take Expedited Discovery #19 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 Second Ex Parte Application For Leave to Take Expedited Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by RingCentral, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Jereige with Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Designation And Disclosure Of Confidential Information #15 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/21/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Refund Status re #16 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-13355908 , Pay.gov Tracking ID: 26HH22EE by RingCentral, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Designation And Disclosure Of Confidential Information filed by RingCentral, Inc.. Responses due by 6/21/2019. Replies due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of D Bloch iso Motion for Protective Order, #2 Proposed Order Protective Order)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff RingCentral, Inc.'s Renewed Ex Parte Application For Leave to Take Expedited Discovery #13 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 Renotice motion hearing re #3 Ex Parte Application re #1 Complaint, For Leave to Take Expedited Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byRingCentral, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Bloch iso Renewed Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of Samuel Zuidema iso Renewed Ex Parte Application, #3 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Ex Parte Application)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/22/2019).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Samuel M. Zuidema Pro Hac Vice representing RingCentral, Inc. #11 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Samuel M. Zuidema ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13356020.) filed by RingCentral, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ARDC Good Standing Letter)(Zuidema, Samuel) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Re: Dkt. #3 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RingCentral, Inc... (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by RingCentral, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Jereige, Amanda) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]* Re-File as Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures under Other Fili ngs*Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re: #2 Statement, filed by RingCentral, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/29/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Order re #3 Ex Parte Application re #1 Complaint, For Leave to Take Expedited Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by RingCentral, Inc.. (Jereige, Amanda) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte Application re #1 Complaint, For Leave to Take Expedited Discovery and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by RingCentral, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Bloch, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Jereige, Amanda) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 *Filing Error* Statement re #1 Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement [Fed.R.Civ. P. 7.1] and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons [Civ. L.R. 3-15] by RingCentral, Inc.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/14/2019) Modified on 5/15/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERFERENCE WITH BUSINESS ADVANTAGES, TRADE LIBEL, UNFAIR COMPETITION, AND TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT against John Does 1-19 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13347735.). Filed byRingCentral, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RingCentral, Inc. v. John Does 1-19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RingCentral, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Represented By: Amanda Jereige
Represented By: Samuel Mack Zuidema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?