Johnson v. Kangarloo et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Nasrin Kangarloo, Jafar Kangarloo and Tofan Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv02672
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to to JAFAR KANGARLOO, IN INDIVIDUAL AND REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE OF THE KANGARLOO FAMILY 2002 TRUST DATED JUNE 6, 2002 ONLY. (Related documents(s) #13 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to NASRIN KANGARLOO, IN INDIVIDUAL AND REPRESENTATIVE CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE OF THE KANGARLOO FAMILY 2002 TRUST DATED JUNE 6, 2002 ONLY. (Related documents(s) #14 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TOFAN ENTERPRISES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Related documents(s) #15 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default As to Tofan Enterprises LLC, a California Limited Liability Company only filed by Scott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default As to Nasrin Kangarloo filed by Scott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default As to Jafar Kangarloo filed by Scott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Tofan Enterprises LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Nasrin Kangarloo served on 5/26/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Jafar Kangarloo served on 5/26/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davilafor all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jafar Kangarloo, Nasrin Kangarloo, Tofan Enterprises LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13357490.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kangarloo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nasrin Kangarloo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jafar Kangarloo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tofan Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?