Sungkyunkwan University Foundation for Corporate Collaboration v. Pinterest, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sungkyunkwan University Foundation for Corporate Collaboration
Defendant: Pinterest, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02677
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sungkyunkwan University Foundation for Corporate Collaboration.. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time for Responsive Pleading filed by Sungkyunkwan University Foundation for Corporate Collaboration. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Pinterest, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by SUNGKYUNKWAN UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION FOR CORPORATE COLLABORATION (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PINTEREST, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13358404.). Filed bySUNGKYUNKWAN UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION FOR CORPORATE COLLABORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sungkyunkwan University Foundation for Corporate Collaboration v. Pinterest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sungkyunkwan University Foundation for Corporate Collaboration
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinterest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?