Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. v. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Golden Rule Produce, Inc. and Dimitrios Tsigaris
Case Number: 5:2019cv02692
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED against Golden Rule Produce, Inc. and Dimitrios Tsigaris IN THE AMOUNT OF 295,713.01. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 Proposed Writ Proposed Writ of Execution by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 Proposed Abstract of Judgment Proposed Abstract of Judgment by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. re #24 Order on Stipulation, #25 Order Notice Of Entry Of Order Approving Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts And For Entry Of Judgment; And Judgment (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 25 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING #23 STIPULATION OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Stipulation,,,,, filed by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Judgment, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Leader-Picone, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT OR RE-FILE STIPULATIONS NO LATER THAN JULY 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/8/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TERMINATING THE PARTIES' PROPOSED ORDERS AT ECF #18 , #19 , AND #20 ; TERMINATING #10 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND VACATING HEARING ON JUNE 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Judgment filed by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts And For Entry Of Judgment. [Proposed] Order Approving Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts And For Entry Of Judgment. filed by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts And For Entry Of Judgment. filed by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #1 [Proposed] Order Approving Stipulation of Undisputed Facts and for Enrty of Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit #2 [Proposed] Judgment, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. re #14 Order on Ex Parte Application, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE; ISSUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #9 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE; ISSUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/20/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMNET. #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF SALINAS VALLEY PRODUCE, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE. Motion Hearings set for 11/21/2019 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case.Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. filed by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2019. Replies due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ALEJANDRO AGUILAR IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION., #2 Declaration OF KAIPO K.B. YOUNG IN SUPPORT of MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION., #3 Affidavit ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION WHY NOTICE SHOULD NOT BE REQUIRED PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b), #4 Supplement MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF Motion FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/18/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE filed by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ALEJANDRO AGUILAR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SALINAS VALLEY PRODUCE, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #2 Declaration OF KAIPO K.B. YOUNG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SALINAS VALLEY PRODUCE, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION., #3 Affidavit ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION WHY NOTICE SHOULD NOT BE REQUIRED PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b), #4 Supplement MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION., #5 [Proposed] Order(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/18/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc... (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Golden Rule Produce, Inc., Dimitrios Tsigaris. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. for Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.. re #1 Complaint,, RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint For Violation Of The Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act (7 U.S.C. 499b Et Seq.), For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief, For Violation Of California Business And Professions Code 17220, For Breach Of Contract, And For Conversion. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13359320.). Filed bySalinas Valley Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Young, Kaipo) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas Valley Produce, Inc. v. Golden Rule Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitrios Tsigaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salinas Valley Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Kaipo K.B. Young
Represented By: Malcolm Leader-Picone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?