Power Integrations, Inc. v. Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Defendant: Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc., Charles Reyes Evangelista, Stuart Hodge, Jr., Edison D. De Lara, The Penbrothers International Inc., Alex F. Mariano and Ian B. Barrameda
Case Number: 5:2019cv02700
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Re: Dkt. No. #20 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/12/2019. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #12 Amended Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Ian B. Barrameda, Edison D. De Lara, Charles Reyes Evangelista, Stuart Hodge, Jr., Alex F. Mariano. (Danzig, Micha) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #12 Amended Complaint, to Extend Time for Defendant The Penbrothers International, Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by The Penbrothers International Inc.. (Whelan, William) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc. [only] by Power Integrations, Inc. (Miclean, David) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant The Penbrothers International, Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by The Penbrothers International Inc.. (Whelan, William) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, To extend time to respond to complaint filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Huston, Paul) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Alex F. Mariano. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ian B. Barrameda. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Proposed Summons to Alex F. Mariano II))(Miclean, David) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants. Filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Miclean, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Power Integrations, Inc. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1; Civ. Local Rule 3-15) (Miclean, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Power Integrations, Inc... (Miclean, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Stuart Hodge, Jr.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Charles Reyes Evangelista. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Edison D. De Lara. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Penbrothers International Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Proposed Summons to Defendant The Penbrothers International, Inc.)), #2 Summons (Proposed Summons to Defendant Edison D. De Lara), #3 Summons (Proposed Summons to Defendant Charles Reyes Evangelista), #4 Summons (Proposed Summons to Defendant Stuart Hodge, Jr.))(Miclean, David) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13360020.). Filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miclean, David) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Integrations, Inc. v. Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silanna Semiconductor North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Reyes Evangelista
Represented By: Micha Danzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Hodge, Jr.
Represented By: Micha Danzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison D. De Lara
Represented By: Micha Danzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Penbrothers International Inc.
Represented By: William Vincent DePaul Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex F. Mariano
Represented By: Micha Danzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian B. Barrameda
Represented By: Micha Danzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: David James Miclean
Represented By: Paul Michael Huston
Represented By: Limin Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?