Brodsky v. eBay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jay Brodsky
Defendant: PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc. and Nael Yakoub
Case Number: 5:2019cv03346
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. Signed by The Clerk on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS; REQUEST TO REASSIGN CASE. Brodsky may object to this order within 14 days of being served with this order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SCREENING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Re: Dkt. No. #2 . The Court GRANTS Brodsky leave to file an amended complaint by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/2/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jay Brodsky. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PayPal, Inc., Nael Yakoub, eBay, Inc. Filed by Jay Brodsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brodsky v. eBay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nael Yakoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?