Abidi v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Michael Abidi
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv03437
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Hess, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint byUNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 Refund Status re #16 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26I6SODU by Michael Abidi. (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.. (Hess, Robert) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendant is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/23/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Abidi. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 *Filing Error. See below for Correct Event* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Abidi (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/8/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/8/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #4 Complaint -- Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Abidi.. (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Abidi (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Filed by Michael Abidi. (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (srnS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 *Duplicate see Dkt #1 * Proposed Summons. (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET RE: COMPLAINT against Michael Abidi ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13443254.). Filed by Michael Abidi. (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Incorrect event used; Modified text to match document on 6/17/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Proposed Summons. (Perkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abidi v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert Edward Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Abidi
Represented By: Charles Balch Perkins
Represented By: Susan D. Pelmulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?