Canal Insurance Co v. A&R Express Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Co
Defendant: Brother's Truck and Trailer Repair, A&R Express Trucking LLC, Carlos Marroquin, SA&R Trucking Company, Inc., Dora Pensamiento, A&R Trucking LLC, Ali Altaye and Selvin Marroquin
Case Number: 5:2019cv03571
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Ali Altaye. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Reissued as to SA&R Trucking Company, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Canal Insurance Co as to SA&R Trucking Company, Inc.. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canal Insurance Co. A&R Express Trucking LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Re-File as Summons Returned Executed* Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #13 Affidavit of Service, filed by Canal Insurance Co (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 *Filing Error* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Orders, other served on Ali Adnan, Registered Agent for A&R Express Trucking LLC on 07/29/2019, filed by Canal Insurance Co. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/5/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Meeks (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference from 9/18/2019 to 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Case Management Statement due 9/25/2019. Parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/9/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to SA&R Trucking Company, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to A&R Express Trucking LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Canal Insurance Co.. (Meeks, Jessica) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Refund Status re #4 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26I8UMPV by Canal Insurance Co. (Foy, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Reimbursement against A&R Express Trucking LLC, A&R Trucking LLC, Ali Altaye, Brother's Truck and Trailer Repair, Carlos Marroquin, Selvin Marroquin, Dora Pensamiento, SA&R Trucking Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13452285.). Filed byCanal Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foy, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal Insurance Co v. A&R Express Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother's Truck and Trailer Repair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&R Express Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Marroquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA&R Trucking Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Pensamiento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&R Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Altaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selvin Marroquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Co
Represented By: Matthew Foy
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?