Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov v. Tesla Inc.
Plaintiff: MMI (a minor) and Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov
Defendant: Tesla Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv03734
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tesla Inc.. Filed byMarlen Mesutovich Izzetov, MMI (a minor). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline changes from prior complaint)(Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/21/2020 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the Order. Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement due by 6/7/2021. Trial Setting Conference set for 6/17/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Dispositive Motion due by 12/2/2021. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2022 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/12/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Tesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #13 Motion to Dismiss; Granting #12 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/6/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Submitting Motions #13 #12 Without Oral Argument And Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/18/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS. Please take NOTICE that the Motion Hearing as to #13 Motion to Dismiss, and #12 Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint set for 2/6/2020 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 4/9/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/26/2020 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byTesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byTesla Inc.. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Chancellor Way-Chan Tseng for Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Tseng, Chancellor) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byMarlen Mesutovich Izzetov, MMI (a minor). (Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byMarlen Mesutovich Izzetov, MMI (a minor). (Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/24/2019 is HEREBY CONTINUED TO 3/26/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla Inc. (Adams, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Tesla, Inc. (Adams, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Tesla Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/10/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (Adams, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Tesla Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/10/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (Adams, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov, MMI (a minor) re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued (Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov, MMI (a minor).. (Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tesla Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 27, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Proposed Summons will not be issued due to lack of Defendant's name on Summons. Please complete Summons listing Defendant's name and re-file in its entirety as Proposed Summons re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by MMI (a minor), Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/27/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov and MMI (a minor) against Tesla Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13472658.). Filed byMarlen Mesutovich Izzetov, MMI (a minor). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tan, Daniel) (Filed on 6/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov v. Tesla Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMI (a minor)
Represented By: Daniel S Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlen Mesutovich Izzetov
Represented By: Daniel S Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Renee Adams
Represented By: Chancellor Way-Chan Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?