Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation and Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv03773
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC.. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP's ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership byMarathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND BY 30 DAYS (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Tropio, Scott) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. All Defendants. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Furman on Behalf of Plaintiff Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership (Furman, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership.. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership identifying Other Affiliate Hossain Khaziri, Other Affiliate Christine Khaziri, Other Affiliate C.H.W.D. Inc., Other Affiliate FirstElement Fuel Inc. for Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13477256.). Filed byNevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Marc) (Filed on 6/28/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Scott Thomas Tropio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Scott Thomas Tropio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Tropio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Deanza Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Marc Robert Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?