Zuffa, LLC v. Latham
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Defendant: James Latham
Case Number: 5:2019cv03814
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zuffa, LLC. James Latham served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Bronshteyn, Yasha) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]* Re-File as Summons Returned Executed * Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #13 Affidavit of Service,, filed by Zuffa, LLC (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 *Filing Error* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Issued Summons, Plaintiff's Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, Consenting to the Jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge - Brochure, Etc. served on James Latham, Individually, and d/b/a East Bay Rats Motorcycle Club on July 18, 2019, filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Bronshteyn, Yasha) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Latham (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Latham.. (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Brandt McCann (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJames Latham. (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Bronshteyn, Yasha) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to James Latham. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]* Re-File Using Copyright Event for Copyright Report* Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #3 Notice (Other) filed by Zuffa, LLC (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/15/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Zuffa, LLC (Bronshteyn, Yasha) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bronshteyn, Yasha) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Latham ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13481867.). Filed byZuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bronshteyn, Yasha) (Filed on 7/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Latham
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: Yasha Bronshteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?