Collins v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: JC Collins
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv03844
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint byHartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by JC Collins (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by JC Collins (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JC Collins.. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13489160.). Filed byJC Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 7/2/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Represented By: Jordan S. Altura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JC Collins
Represented By: Scott E. Shaffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?