Wood v. County of Contra Costa et al
Petitioner: Andrea C. Wood
Respondent: Benjamin Packwood, M.D. Ravinder Bains, Lois Haight, Erica Bains and County of Contra Costa
Case Number: 5:2019cv03885
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
2 Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Contra Costa re #29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Writ Petition, #30 Request for Judicial Notice (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 Request for Judicial Notice re #29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Writ Petition filed byCounty of Contra Costa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Writ Petition filed by County of Contra Costa. Responses due by 9/13/2019. Replies due by 9/20/2019. (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Contra Costa re #27 Reply to Opposition/Response (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY (re #20 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Quash ) filed byCounty of Contra Costa. (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 33 Request for Judicial Notice filed byAndrea C. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 32 Received Document by Andrea C. Wood. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Andrea C. Wood. Responses due by 9/12/2019. Replies due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrea C. Wood (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrea C. Wood (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 OPPOSITION Memorandum (re #4 MOTION to Quash Service of Process ) filed by Andrea C. Wood. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed byLois Haight. (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 11, 2019 Filing 23 OPPOSITION (re #4 MOTION to Quash Service of Process ) filed byAndrea C. Wood. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2019)
August 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #20 MOTION to Quash Service of Process (Re-Noti ced) filed by County of Contra Costa (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Quash Service of Process(Re-Noticed) filed by County of Contra Costa. Responses due by 8/21/2019. Replies due by 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 8/7/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lois Haight. Responses due by 8/8/2019. Replies due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of Andrea C. Wood in Support of #16 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Andrea C. Wood. (Related document(s) #16 ) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) filed by Andrea C. Wood. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY (re #4 MOTION to Quash Service of Process ) filed byCounty of Contra Costa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lois Haight re #11 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Amended Proof of Service (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lois Haight re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Amended Proof of Service (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lois Haight.. (Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionAmended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lois Haight. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 8/8/2019. Replies due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order, #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nagle, Sharon) (Filed on 7/25/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #8 Opposition/Response to Motion to Quash Service of Process filed by Andrea C. Wood. (Related document(s) #8 ) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #4 MOTION to Quash Service of Process) filed by Andrea C. Wood. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 and 28 U.S.C. Section 2243 against Erica Bains, Ravinder Bains, County of Contra Costa, Lois Haight, Benjamin Packwood. Filed by Andrea C. Wood. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Contra Costa.. (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants County of Contra Costs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/25/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by County of Contra Costa. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 7/31/2019. Replies due by 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea C. Wood. Erica Bains served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Ravinder Bains served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; County of Contra Costa served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Lois Haight served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Benjamin Packwood served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrea C. Wood. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00-#34611143363.). Filed byAndrea C. Wood. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Benjamin Packwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M.D. Ravinder Bains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lois Haight
Represented By: Sharon Margaret Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Erica Bains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: Sean Michael Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrea C. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?