Mason v. Rhodes et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Mason
Defendant: Jeffrey Bird, Emmett Cunningham, Jr., Restoration Robotics, Inc., Frederic Moll, Craig Taylor, Gil Kliman, Ryan Rhodes and Shelley Thunen
Case Number: 5:2019cv03997
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
2 Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Granting #13 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss in Related Case Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/21/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings RE 64 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASE Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/21/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:18-cv-03712 EJD and 5:19-cv-03997 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/13/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay of Action and Related Matters filed by Jeffrey Bird, Emmett Cunningham, Jr, Gil Kliman, Frederic Moll, Restoration Robotics, Inc., Ryan Rhodes, Craig Taylor, Shelley Thunen. (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeffrey Bird, Emmett Cunningham, Jr, Gil Kliman, Frederic Moll, Restoration Robotics, Inc., Ryan Rhodes, Craig Taylor, Shelley Thunen (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Restoration Robotics, Inc. (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary Hellmuth Mattis (Mattis, Hilary) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Rawlinson (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Mason. Service waived by Jeffrey Bird waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Emmett Cunningham, Jr waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Gil Kliman waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Frederic Moll waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Restoration Robotics, Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Ryan Rhodes waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Craig Taylor waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Shelley Thunen waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/29/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Bird, Emmett Cunningham, Jr, Gil Kliman, Frederic Moll, Restoration Robotics, Inc., Ryan Rhodes, Craig Taylor, Shelley Thunen. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Complaint by Lesley F. Portnoy on behalf of Thomas Mason (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13511522.). Filed byThomas Mason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 7/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Rhodes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mason
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bird
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmett Cunningham, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restoration Robotics, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederic Moll
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Taylor
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil Kliman
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Thunen
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Hilary Hellmuth Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?