Transaction Secure, LLC v. Stripe, Inc.
Plaintiff: Transaction Secure, LLC
Defendant: Stripe, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04052
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101) filed by Stripe, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristin L. Cleveland ISO MTD, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Cleveland, Kristin) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #17 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Pate nt filed by Transaction Secure, LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent Pursuant to Patent L. R. 2-1(a). Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Transaction Secure, LLC (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 8/16/2019) Modified on 8/19/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Transaction Secure, LLC (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING re #13 Stipulation to Extend Time for Stripe to Respond to the Complaint filed by Stripe, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/7/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Stripe, Inc., shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend the Time for Stripe, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint filed by Stripe, Inc.. (Cleveland, Kristin) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stripe, Inc. (Cleveland, Kristin) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin L. Cleveland (Cleveland, Kristin) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transaction Secure, LLC. Stripe, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Transaction Secure, LLC.. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Stripe, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Certification of Interested Parties by Transaction Secure, LLC (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Transaction Secure, LLC . (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Stripe, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13519787.). Filed by Transaction Secure, LLC. (Watson, Coleman) (Filed on 7/15/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transaction Secure, LLC v. Stripe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stripe, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin L. Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transaction Secure, LLC
Represented By: Coleman Washington Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?