RLI Insurance Company v. ACE American Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: RLI Insuance Company
Defendant: RossDrulisCusenbery Architecture, Inc. and ACE American Insurance Co.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04180
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byACE American Insurance Co.. (Berke, David) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to ACE American Insurance Co. Cross Defendant (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 CROSSCLAIM against ACE American Insurance Co.. Filed byRossDrulisCusenbery Architecture, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Proposed))(Eagle, Shanti) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RossDrulisCusenbery Architecture, Inc. (Eagle, Shanti) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byRossDrulisCusenbery Architecture, Inc.. (Eagle, Shanti) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading)(Davila, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Stipulation of Plaintiff RLI Insurance Company and Defendant ACE American Insurance Company Enlarging The Time For Filing Responsive Pleading filed by RLI Insuance Company. (Crane, Steven) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RLI Insuance Company. RossDrulisCusenbery Architecture, Inc. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Crane, Steven) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RLI Insuance Company. ACE American Insurance Co. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Crane, Steven) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for October 30, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RLI Insuance Company.. (Julien, Laurie) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ACE American Insurance Co., RossDrulisCusenbery Architecture, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by RLI Insuance Company identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc., Corporate Parent State Street Corp. for RLI Insuance Company. re #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint for Declaratory Relief (Crane, Steven) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Crane, Steven) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF... against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13537600.). Filed byRLI Insuance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crane, Steven) (Filed on 7/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RLI Insurance Company v. ACE American Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RossDrulisCusenbery Architecture, Inc.
Represented By: Shanti Eagle
Represented By: Tyler Churchill Gerking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Co.
Represented By: David Michael Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLI Insuance Company
Represented By: Steven M. Crane
Represented By: Laurie Susan Julien
Represented By: Nicholas William Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?