Tevra Brands LLC v. Bayer HealthCare LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Tevra Brands LLC
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Animal Health GmbH and Bayer AG
Case Number: 5:2019cv04312
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (KATHERINE E. CLEMONS). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/23/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Katherine E. Clemons ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695033.) filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Clemons, Katherine) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #21 TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/05/2019.(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, - TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Bayer Healthcare LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tevra Brands LLC.. (Gambhir, Nitin) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alexa DiCunzolo representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CERTIFICATE of Good Standing ISO PHV Application at Dkt. 13 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26JC6SFU.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/08/19 filed by Tevra Brands LLC. (DiCunzolo, Alexa) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13592000.) filed by Tevra Brands LLC. (DiCunzolo, Alexa) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney G. Gabriel Zorogastua representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel D. Owen representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13578428.) filed by Tevra Brands LLC. (Zorogastua, Guillermo) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13577027.) filed by Tevra Brands LLC. (Owen, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, ADR Cert, Standing Order, ADR Local Rules, Order Setting Initial CMC and ADR Deadlines, Standing Order for all Judges-Contents for Joint CMC, Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge served on Bayer Healthcare LLC on 07/31/19, filed by Tevra Brands LLC. (Gambhir, Nitin) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Animal Health GmbH, Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Gambhir, Nitin) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Gambhir, Nitin) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gambhir, Nitin) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Antitrust Violations of the Clayton Act 3 (Exclusive Dealing and Tying) and the Sherman Act 2 (Maintenance of a Monopoly) against Bayer HealthCare LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13558358.). Filed byTevra Brands LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gambhir, Nitin) (Filed on 7/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tevra Brands LLC v. Bayer HealthCare LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Katherine Elaine Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Animal Health GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tevra Brands LLC
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Represented By: Daniel D. Owen
Represented By: Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua
Represented By: Alexa Rae DiCunzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?