Downey v. US of America
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: US of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv04338
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONFIRMING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Re: Dkt. No. #8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 USCA No. 19-16810. USCA Scheduling Order. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Mark Downey opening brief due 11/18/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Downey 's response due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Downey. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Mark Downey. Filing fee $ 505-Not Paid. Appeal Record due by 10/9/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/19/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SCREENING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Re: Dkt. Nos. #1 , #2 . The Court GRANTS Downey leave to file an amended complaint by 9/6/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Downey. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US of America. Filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. US of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?