Naylor et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Hayley Goldfeld, James Kile, Jeannette Taylor, KENNETH WOOLSEY, Robyn Lipetz, Hannah Stratton, Zoe Naylor, Erica Dillard, Amy Norman, Ronald Hawkins, Tim Morgan, Laura Carlo, Yuichi Murakami, GERALD TIANO, Long Lauren, Kimberly Brown, Shemina Gheewalla and Fredrick Christensen
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04421
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE to 5:18-md-02827-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re Order Relating Case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint as to Apple Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Zoe Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline First Amended Complaint, #2 Summons First Amended Complaint - Summons in a Civil Action)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:19-cv-04421 NC and 5:18-md-02827 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/5/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings RE #6 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/2/19. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13571362.). Filed byLAURA CARLO, KENNETH WOOLSEY, HANNAH STRATTON, SHEMINA GHEEWALLA, ZOE NAYLOR, YUICHI MURAKAMI, TIM MORGAN, JAMES KILE, RONALD HAWKINS, ERICA DILLARD, LONG LAUREN, ROBYN LIPETZ, HAYLEY GOLDFELD, AMY NORMAN, FREDRICK CHRISTENSEN, KIMBERLY BROWN, JEANETTE TAYLOR, GERALD TIANO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/31/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naylor et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayley Goldfeld
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kile
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Taylor
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH WOOLSEY
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Lipetz
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Stratton
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe Naylor
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Dillard
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Norman
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hawkins
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Morgan
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Carlo
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuichi Murakami
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD TIANO
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Lauren
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Brown
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shemina Gheewalla
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Christensen
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?